Smith v. Walmart Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Katrina Smith
Defendant: Walmart Louisiana L L C, X Y Z Insurance Co, Wal-Mart Stores Inc and X Y Z Roofing Co
Case Number: 1:2019cv00447
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/24/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/24/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Walmart Louisiana L L C and Katrina Smith. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Fontenot, Philip) Modified filers on 6/19/2019 (Bunting, M).
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Walmart Louisiana L L C and Katrina Smith. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Fontenot, Philip) Modified filers on 6/19/2019 (Bunting, M).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 2 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/20/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PLAN OF WORK filed by All Parties. Discovery deadline 5/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2019. Final Date for Expert Employment 1/31/2020. Exchange of Expert Reports due by 3/27/2020. Expert Depositions due by 5/29/2020. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 6/30/2019. See Order for remainder of deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/20/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The Pretrial Conference is RESET for 10/15/2020 at 10:30 AM, in chambers, before Judge Dee D Drell. See Order #16 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/20/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Proposed Plan of Work. Pretrial Conference is set for 10/17/2020 at 1:45 PM, in chambers, before Judge Dee D Drell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/20/2019. (crt,Tice, Y) (Main Document 16 replaced on 5/31/2019 to reflect new date for the pretrial conference by the law clerk) (Tice, Y).
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/20/2019 granting 14 Motion for Extension. (Court Reporter: LCR, Alexandria - 3rd Floor) (crt,Tice, Y)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT ORAL MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Plan of Work deadlines. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Michael J Williamson for Katrina Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/9/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 5/20/2019 at 9:45 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Plan of Work, pretrial procedures, anticipated discovery issues, dispositive motions, and settlement prospects. Counsel shall arrive ten minutes before the status conference to meet with the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/7/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Michael J. Williamson to Enroll as Counsel by Katrina Smith. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Broussard, Aaron)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED Plan of Work by Walmart Louisiana L L C and Katrina Smith. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Fontenot, Philip) Modified filers on 5/2/2019 (Bunting, M).
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Louisiana L L C. (12th JDC, 2019-6490 filed 3-20-2019), attached to the Response to Removal Order #8 .(crt,Bunting, M)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Walmart Louisiana L L C . (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(aty,Fontenot, Philip)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 6/8/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Louisiana L L C identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East L P, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East Inc, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Texas L P, Other Affiliate Walmart Inc, Other Affiliate WSE Management, L L C, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, L L C for Walmart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Fontenot, Philip)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/11/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/11/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Gretchen Fritchie Richards, Anne Elise Brodsky, Philip Andre' Fontenot on behalf of Walmart Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/24/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 12th JDC Avoyelles Parish, Case Number 2019-6490 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3920782) filed by Walmart Louisiana L L C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 State court petition, #3 State court return of service, #4 Exhibit B-Medical Records, #5 State Court Notice of Removal, #6 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Philip Andre' Fontenot added to party Walmart Louisiana L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Fontenot, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Walmart Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Represented By: Gretchen Fritchie Richards
Represented By: Jami Lacour Ishee
Represented By: Anne Elise Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Roofing Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Smith
Represented By: Edmond Humphries Knoll
Represented By: Aaron James Broussard
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?