McLain v. Herrington et al

Plaintiff: Sheila McLain
Defendant: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Co, S R T Oil Field Service L L C, Edward Gene Herrington, Cherokee Insurance Co and Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2019cv00454
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 8/8/2019 at 3:00 PM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Plan of Work, pretrial procedures, anticipated discovery issues, dispositive motions, and settlement prospects. Counsel shall arrive ten minutes before the status conference to meet with the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/25/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED Plan of Work by Cherokee Insurance Co, Edward Gene Herrington, S R T Oil Field Service L L C, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Co, Sheila McLain. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Tolbird, Grant) Modified on 6/17/2019 to add filers (JonesSld, P).
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sheila McLain. (aty,DeLouche, Kenneth)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hallmark Dec Page, #2 Exhibit B - C. Bettinger Report)(aty,Remondet, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Cherokee Insurance Co, Edward Gene Herrington, S R T Oil Field Service L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Farm Bureau Petition, #2 Exhibit B-Funeral Bill, #3 Exhibit C-Cemetery Bill, #4 Exhibit D-Gravestone Bill, #5 Exhibit E-Flower Expenses, #6 Exhibit F-Bettinger Report)(aty,Tolbird, Grant)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and an additional 10 days to file a memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's motion to remand and opposition to sua sponte summary dismissal of defendant Farm Bureau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/28/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees with consent by Cherokee Insurance Co, Edward Gene Herrington, S R T Oil Field Service L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Tolbird, Grant) Modified on 5/24/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Sheila McLain. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proposed order)(crt,JonesSld, P)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Remondet, Michael)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #10 Answer to Complaint, sent to Michael J Remondet, Jr on behalf of Hallmark Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/10/2019. (crt,Whidden, C)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney Michael J Remondet, Jr added to party Hallmark Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Remondet, Michael)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cherokee Insurance Co, Edward Gene Herrington, S R T Oil Field Service L L C.(aty,Tolbird, Grant)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 6/9/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/12/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by S R T Oil Field Service L L C. (aty,Tolbird, Grant)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cherokee Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Oakland Financial Corp for Cherokee Insurance Co. (aty,Tolbird, Grant)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Cherokee Insurance Co, Edward Gene Herrington, S R T Oil Field Service L L C of Certificate of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) re #1 Notice of Removal,, (aty,Tolbird, Grant)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal,,, sent to M Shane Craighead, Grant Matthew Tolbird on behalf of Cherokee Insurance Co, S R T Oil Field Service L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/25/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 10, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 7th JDC Concordia Parish, Case Number 52,066 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3921825) filed by Cherokee Insurance Co, S R T Oil Field Service L L C, Edward Gene Herrington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Suit Record (Concordia Parish), #2 Exhibit B-Cherokee Declarations Pages, #3 Exhibit C-Hallmark Declarations Page, #4 Exhibit D-Hallmark Consent to Removal, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Grant Matthew Tolbird added to party Cherokee Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Grant Matthew Tolbird added to party Edward Gene Herrington(pty:dft), Attorney Grant Matthew Tolbird added to party S R T Oil Field Service L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Tolbird, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLain v. Herrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Michael J Remondet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S R T Oil Field Service L L C
Represented By: Grant Matthew Tolbird
Represented By: M Shane Craighead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Gene Herrington
Represented By: Grant Matthew Tolbird
Represented By: M Shane Craighead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee Insurance Co
Represented By: Grant Matthew Tolbird
Represented By: M Shane Craighead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila McLain
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Represented By: Anthony J Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?