Martinez v. Ramos et al
Petitioner: Ronald Martinez
Respondent: matthew albence, Brian Acuna, Indalecio Ramos, KEVIN MCALEENAN and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00560
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Martinez. Brian Acuna served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Matthew Albence served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; William Barr served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Kevin McAleenan served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Indalecio Ramos served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on 6 on 05/16/2019, filed by Ronald Martinez. (aty,Scott, Paul)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Indalecio Ramos, Brian Acuna, Matthew Albence, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr (crt,Haik, K)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Brian Acuna, Matthew Albence, William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Indalecio Ramos, submitted by Ronald Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons/writ Brian Acuna, #2 Proposed summons/writ David Joseph, #3 Proposed summons/writ Kevin McAleenan, #4 Proposed summons/writ Matthew Albence, #5 Proposed summons/writ William Barr)(aty,Scott, Paul) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/14/2019) (Haik, K). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/14/2019) (Haik, K). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/14/2019) (Haik, K). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/14/2019) (Haik, K). (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/14/2019) (Haik, K). (Attachment 5 replaced on 5/14/2019) (Haik, K).
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/6/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
May 1, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0536-3938130) filed by Ronald Martinez.(Attorney Paul Hugh Scott added to party Ronald Martinez(pty:pet))(aty,Scott, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Ramos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: matthew albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Acuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Indalecio Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Martinez
Represented By: Paul Hugh Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?