Brown v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Jarvis Brown
Defendant: William Easterling, Tyson Bonnette, W S McCain, Eddie Duplechain and James M LeBlanc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00600
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST for Issuance of Summonses/Request for proof of service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #10 MOTION to Serve filed by Jarvis Brown, 16 Order on Motion to Serve. IT IS ORDERED that service of process be WITHHELD pending the outcome of the Court's standard initial review under 28 U.S.C. 1915, 1915A, and/or further orders from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/19/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel and #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/11/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $14.36. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/11/2019. (crt,HaikSld, K)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Motion to Serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/11/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER re #14 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarvis Brown. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against Tyson Bonnette, Eddie Duplechain, William Easterling, James M LeBlanc, W S McCain with Jury Demand filed by Jarvis Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) Modified to correct file date on 6/11/2019 (Haik, K).
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Support by Jarvis Brown re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jarvis Brown. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Service by Marshals by Jarvis Brown. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS/REQUEST for Issuance of Summonses as to Tyson Bonnette, Eddie Duplechain, William Easterling, James M LeBlanc, W S McCain, submitted by Jarvis Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jarvis Brown. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit/envelope, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/15/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 1983 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,HaikSld, K)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00194. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/9/2019. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/9/2019.]
April 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/9/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Jarvis Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/9/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tyson Bonnette, Eddie Duplechain, William Easterling, James M. LeBlanc, W. S. McCain, filed by Jarvis Brown. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Bonnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W S McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Duplechain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarvis Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?