Marsh v. Barr
Plaintiff: Joan Marie Marsh
Defendant: William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00647
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT adopting #6 Report and Recommendations denying and dismissing petition without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 7/17/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED that #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling should her confinement become unconstitutional. Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/11/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)(a)
June 3, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Joan Marie Marsh in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635061707. (crt,Delgado, S)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joan Marie Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/22/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 20, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joan Marie Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibit, #4 Letter, #5 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsh v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Marie Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?