Francisco v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Figuereo Lorenzo Francisco
Defendant: D C Cole, David Rivera, Matthew Albence and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00704
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Warden Pine Prairie Correctional Center. Served on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney General. Served on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney, District Director ICE. Served on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Figuereo Lorenzo Francisco, Pine Prairie Correctional Center, re: #8 Sec P - Service Order returned marked: Return to Sender. (crt,Haik, K)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Warden Pine Prairie Correctional Center, District Director ICE, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts)(crt,Haik, K)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Figuereo Lorenzo Francisco, LaSalle Detention Facility, re: #4 Sec P - Deficiency Order, returned marked: Return to Sender. Action taken: Clerk previously resent to Pine Prairie Correctional Center. (crt,Haik, K)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/1/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Figuereo Lorenzo Francisco at LaSalle Detention Facility re: #4 Sec P - Deficiency Order returned marked: Return to Sender - Not Here, Unable to Forward. Action taken: On 6/10/19 the clerk updated plaintiff's address to Pine Prairie Correctional Center. Resent #4 Memorandum Order and forms to updated address this date. (crt,Reeves, T)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Figuereo Lorenzo Francisco, LaSalle Detention Facility, re: 3 Jurisdictional Review Finding, returned marked: return to sender. no longer here. (crt,Haik, K)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Figuereo Lorenzo Francisco. Clerk updated address to Pine Prairie Correctional Center. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 7, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Figuereo Lorenzo Francisco in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635061752. (crt,Adams, K)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus form, #2 In Forma Pauperis form)(crt,Williams, L)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/5/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 3, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Figuereo Lorenzo Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A). Application not on approved form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francisco v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Figuereo Lorenzo Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D C Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?