LaGrange et al v. Boone et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel LaGrange and Amanda LaGrange
Defendant: Honda R & D Co Ltd, KLLM Transport Services, LLC, Hub International Transportation Insurance Services Inc, Honda Motor Co Ltd, Honda R&D Co., Ltd., Roamer Transport, Inc., Great West Casualty Co, American Honda Motor Co., Inc., American Honda Motor Co Inc, Harley E. Boone, K L L M Transport Services L L C, Harley E Boone and Roamer Transport Inc
Intervenor Plaintiff: Progressive Security Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2019cv00755
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Patrick J O'Cain for American Honda Motor Co Inc. Attorney Charles Spencer Smith terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/6/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Deirdre C McGlinchey on behalf of American Honda Motor Co Inc regarding #30 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Patrick J. O'Cain in place of Charles S. Smith with consent, #24 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Patrick J. O'Cain in place of Charles S. Smith with consent sought but not yet obtained. Action taken: Terminated #24 Motion to Substitute. #30 Motion to Substitute resubmitted in its entirety. (crt,Crick, S)
August 5, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Patrick J. O'Cain in place of Charles S. Smith with consent by American Honda Motor Co Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 First MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, 2, 3)(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
August 1, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deficiency to Deirdre C McGlinchey on behalf of American Honda Motor Co Inc regarding #24 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Patrick J. O'Cain in place of Charles S. Smith. Reason: Not signed by or have consent of the withdrawing attorney. (crt,Reeves, T)
July 30, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roamer Transport Inc. (aty,Montgomery, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great West Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp, Corporate Parent O R I Great West Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Old Republic General Insurance Group Inc, Corporate Parent Old Republic International Group for Great West Casualty Co. (aty,Montgomery, Richard) Modified to add corporate parents on 7/30/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
July 30, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K L L M Transport Services L L C identifying Corporate Parent Investment Transportation Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Duff Capital Investors, LLC for K L L M Transport Services L L C. (aty,Truitt, Jack)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 DEFICIENT. MOTION to Substitute Attorney Patrick J. O'Cain in place of Charles S. Smith with consent sought but not yet obtained by American Honda Motor Co Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre) Modified on 8/1/2019 to reflect deficient status (Reeves, T). Modified on 8/6/2019 to indicate #30 Motion to Substitute resubmitted in its entirety. (Crick, S).
July 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Motion for Leave to File, sent to Jack Etherton Truitt on behalf of K L L M Transport Services L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/12/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Answer to Amended Complaint, sent to Richard R Montgomery on behalf of Great West Casualty Co, Roamer Transport Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/12/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #20 MOTION to Dismiss the Cross-claim filed on behalf of KLLM Transport Services, LLC, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Alternatively MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion day set for 9/13/2019 before Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss the Cross-claim filed on behalf of KLLM Transport Services, LLC by Roamer Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Statement of material facts, #4 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Montgomery, Richard). Added MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on 7/29/2019 (ThomasSld, T). Modified to add motion events on 7/29/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand by American Honda Motor Co Inc.(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: as to #16 First MOTION to Remand and MOTION for Attorney Fees. Oral Argument set for 8/20/2019 at 1:00 PM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/15/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #16 First MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Remand by Amanda LaGrange, Gabriel LaGrange. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Dunahoe, Jared). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 7/12/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 CROSSCLAIM against Roamer Transport Inc filed by K L L M Transport Services L L C.(crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Cross Claim. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 7/8/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint by Harley E Boone, Great West Casualty Co, Roamer Transport Inc.(aty,Montgomery, Richard)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER DISMISSING Intervenor defendant Hub International Transportation Insurance Services Inc, signed June 12, 2019 in state court proceeding. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #12 RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 3, 2019 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand by K L L M Transport Services L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #12 RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Honda Motor Co Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #12 RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER DISMISSING Hub International Transportation Insurance Services Inc, signed April 17, 2019 in state court proceeding. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #12 RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint, ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by K L L M Transport Services L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #12 RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint, Answer to First Amended Complaint, by Progressive Security Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #12 RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint, Answer to First Amended Complaint, Answer to Second Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Great West Casualty Co, Hub International Transportation Insurance Services Inc, Roamer Transport Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #12 RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Harley E Boone. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #12 RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by American Honda Motor Co Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified State Court Record Part 1, #2 Exhibit Certified State Court Record Part 2)(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Honda Motor Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co Ltd for American Honda Motor Co Inc. (aty,Smith, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Colvin G Norwood, Jr, Deirdre C McGlinchey, Charles Spencer Smith on behalf of American Honda Motor Co Inc. Show Cause Response due by 7/16/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Intervenor Complaint, First Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal (Petition for Damages). American Honda Motor Co Inc answer due 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/25/2019. (crt,Whidden, C)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Cross Claim with consent sought but not yet obtained by K L L M Transport Services L L C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Truitt, Jack)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by American Honda Motor Co Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Smith, Charles) Modified to remove duplicate docket text on 6/24/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/18/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/17/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 8/13/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Colvin G Norwood, Jr, Deirdre C McGlinchey, Charles Spencer Smith on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/28/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 14, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 14, 2019 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Progressive Security Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #7 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
June 14, 2019 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDING COMPLAINT against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Harley E. Boone, Great West Casualty Co, Honda Motor Co Ltd, Honda R&D Co., Ltd., Hub International Transportation Insurance Services Inc, KLLM Transport Services, LLC, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Roamer Transport, Inc. filed by Amanda LaGrange, Gabriel LaGrange. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
June 14, 2019 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDING COMPLAINT against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Harley E. Boone, Great West Casualty Co, Honda Motor Co Ltd, Honda R&D Co., Ltd., Hub International Transportation Insurance Services Inc, KLLM Transport Services, LLC, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Roamer Transport, Inc. filed by Amanda LaGrange, Gabriel LaGrange. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 10th JDC Natchitoches Parish, Case Number 90887 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3972981) filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Supp/Amending Petitions, #4 Exhibit Dismissal of Hub, #5 Exhibit Medical bill summary, #6 Exhibit Progressive intervention, #7 Exhibit Intervention order, #8 Exhibit Consents to removal)(Attorney Colvin G Norwood, Jr added to party American Honda Motor Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Norwood, Colvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaGrange et al v. Boone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R & D Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLLM Transport Services, LLC
Represented By: Peter Martin Gahagan
Represented By: Jack Etherton Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hub International Transportation Insurance Services Inc
Represented By: James M Dill
Represented By: Richard R Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roamer Transport, Inc.
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Co
Represented By: James M Dill
Represented By: Richard R Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre C McGlinchey
Represented By: Colvin G Norwood, Jr
Represented By: Charles Spencer Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Represented By: Deirdre C McGlinchey
Represented By: Colvin G Norwood, Jr
Represented By: Charles Spencer Smith
Represented By: Patrick J O'Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley E. Boone
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K L L M Transport Services L L C
Represented By: Peter Martin Gahagan
Represented By: Jack Etherton Truitt
Represented By: Lou Anne Milliman
Represented By: Michelle Mayne Davis
Represented By: Thomas Jeffrey Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley E Boone
Represented By: James M Dill
Represented By: Richard R Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roamer Transport Inc
Represented By: James M Dill
Represented By: Richard R Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Progressive Security Insurance Co
Represented By: Anthony J Milazzo, Jr
Represented By: Charles V Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel LaGrange
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Represented By: Samuel Charles Ward
Represented By: Jared Ryan Dunahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda LaGrange
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Represented By: Samuel Charles Ward
Represented By: Jared Ryan Dunahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?