Brown v. LeBlanc et al
Plaintiff: Jarvis Brown
Defendant: Jamie Veads, Unknown Nurse, Warden McCain, LA Dept of Safety & Corrections, Stephen Bordelon, Raymond Laborde Correctional Center, R Hegger and James M LeBlanc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00847
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IT IS RECOMMENDED that all claims against Defendant LeBlanc be denied and dismissed with prejudice. Brown's complaints will be served on the remaining defendants pursuant to a separate order. Objections to R&R due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/22/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jarvis Brown. Clerk updated plaintiff's address to LSP per envelope of doc. 25 in civil action 19-600. (crt,Haik, K)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/9/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $14.36. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/26/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER re #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support by Jarvis Brown re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support by Jarvis Brown re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarvis Brown. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jarvis Brown. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST from Jarvis Brown for 1983 form and status of complaint. Clerk mailed 1983 complaint form, 1915 IFP form, and docket sheet on 7/12/19. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Adams, K)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/8/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 27, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarvis Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) Application not on approved forms.
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen Bordelon, R Hegger, James M LeBlanc, McCain, Raymond Laborde Correctional Center, LA Dept of Safety & Corrections, Unknown Nurse, Jamie Veads filed by Jarvis Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Veads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Safety & Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Laborde Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarvis Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?