Frick v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: David B Frick
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00860
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Crick, S)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Barbara J Mixon on behalf of David B Frick regarding #5 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: Docket text modified to reflect correct answer due date of 10/22/2019 as an incorrect answer date was entered at the time of e-filing. (crt,Crick, S)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David B Frick. Nancy A Berryhill served on 7/24/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration served on 7/24/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (aty,Mixon, Barbara) Modified on 7/30/2019 to correct answer due date as an erroneous answer due date was entered at time of e-filing. (Crick, S).
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/10/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Crick, S)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/9/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
July 8, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 8, 2019 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David B Frick. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 COMPLAINT. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 8, 2019 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to All Defendants, requested by David B Frick. (aty,Mixon, Barbara)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by David B Frick. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Affidavit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #3 Proposed order)(Attorney Barbara J Mixon added to party David B Frick(pty:pla))(aty,Mixon, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frick v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B Frick
Represented By: Barbara J Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?