Santos- Carlos v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Dos Santos- Carlos and Antonio Dos Santos-Carlos
Defendant: Matthew Albence, Kevin McAleenan, David C Cole and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00878
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Warden Adams County Correctional Center, District Director ICE. Served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to U S Attorney. Served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Warden Adams County Correctional Center, District Director ICE, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts)(crt,Haik, K)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/22/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT (Letter) re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Antonio Dos Santos-Carlos. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
August 5, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Antonio Dos Santos-Carlos in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 14635002912. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Antonio Dos Santos-Carlos, LaSalle Processing Center, re: #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, returned marked: Return to Sender; No Longer Here; Refused. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Antonio Dos Santos-Carlos, LaSalle Processing Center, re: 4 Jurisdictional Review Finding, returned marked: Return to Sender; No Longer Here; Refused. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Antonio Dos Santos-Carlos. Clerk updated plaintiff's address to Adams County Correctional Center, P O Box 1600, Washington, MS 39190 and resent docs. #6 & #7 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that petitioner pay the $5.00 filing fee within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in the petition being stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/11/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/11/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 8, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio Dos Santos- Carlos. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Antonio Dos Santos- Carlos. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos- Carlos v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Dos Santos- Carlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Dos Santos-Carlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?