Coronado v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Plaintiff: Nervin Euclides Coronado
Defendant: Warden Alexandria Staging Facility, Field Office Director New York, U S Attorney General and Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00918
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Warden Alexandria Staging Facility, U S Attorney General, Field Office Director New York, Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Dismiss #12 be GRANTED and Coronados Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 be DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, WITH PREJUDICE as to the jurisdictional issue and WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the merits of Coronados claim Objections to R&R due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes (a) on 9/3/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Nervin Euclides Coronado, Alexandria Staging Facility, re: #13 Notice of Motion Setting returned marked: Return to Sender. (crt,Haik, K)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,HaikSld, K)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Warden Alexandria Staging Facility, U S Attorney General, Field Office Director New York, Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A-Removal Doc.)(aty,Walker, Cristina)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Nervin Euclides Coronado, Alexandria Staging Facility, re: 9 Jurisdictional Review Finding, returned marked: RTS; Refused; Unable to forward. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Walker on behalf of Warden Alexandria Staging Facility, U S Attorney General, Field Office Director New York, Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security (Attorney Cristina Walker added to party Warden Alexandria Staging Facility(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina Walker added to party U S Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina Walker added to party Field Office Director New York(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina Walker added to party Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft)) (aty,Walker, Cristina)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/18/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) Modified to indicate proposed order was filed in error on 7/18/2019 (Haik, K).
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-03782. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
July 12, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 12, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Western District of Louisiana. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Petitioner is currently in the custody of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement at a detention facility in Alexandria, Louisiana. (Dkt. 5.) Because jurisdiction for a habeas petition filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 "lies only in the district of [Petitioner's] confinement," Freire v. Terry, 756 F. Supp. 2d 585, 586 (S.D.N.Y. 2010), this Court has no authority to grant Petitioner the relief he seeks in his 2241 petition. See also Rumsfeld v. Padilla, 542 U.S. 426, 444 (2004) ("[F]or [ 2241] habeas petitions challenging present physical confinement, jurisdiction lies in only one district: the district of confinement."). The Court therefore GRANTS Respondents' motion to dismiss this action for improper venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and TRANSFERS this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, which is where Petitioner is currently confined. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/11/2019. (Nadig, Alok) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The #6 requested extension is GRANTED. Respondents shall shall respond to the habeas petition by August 12, 2019. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/11/2019. (Nadig, Alok) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the petition for writ of habeas corpus sine die in light of the Government's pending motion to dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and for improper venue; and to further respectfully submit that there is no impediment to Petitioner's removal from the United States by Alexandria, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director New York, Secretary of The Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Local Civil Rule 12.1 and 56.2 Statement) (Marutollo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or alternatively, motion to dismiss for improper venue by Alexandria, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director New York, Secretary of The Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Marutollo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Anthony Marutollo on behalf of Alexandria, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director New York, Secretary of The Department of Homeland Security (aty to be noticed) (Marutollo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Government is directed to respond to the Petition by July 12, 2019. The Court denies, at this time, Petitioner's request for a Temporary Restraining Order. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/1/2019. (Manzo, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
June 28, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 5.00, receipt number 27991 (Kanellopoulos, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Unsigned Order to Show Cause by Nervin Euclides Coronado (Kanellopoulos, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Nervin Euclides Coronado. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Kanellopoulos, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Nervin Euclides Coronado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kanellopoulos, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coronado v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Alexandria Staging Facility
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Marutollo
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director New York
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Marutollo
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Attorney General
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Marutollo
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Marutollo
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nervin Euclides Coronado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?