Ponthie Holdings L L C v. Freeman Holdings of Louisiana L L C et al
Plaintiff: Ponthie Holdings L L C
Defendant: United States Aircraft Insurance Group, United States Aviation Underwriters Inc and Freeman Holdings of Louisiana L L C
Case Number: 1:2019cv01007
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Ponthie Holdings L L C. (aty,Wilmore, Randall)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Freeman Holdings of Louisiana L L C, United States Aircraft Insurance Group, United States Aviation Underwriters Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Chris Bello, #2 Exhibit 1-A-Member Companies List, #3 Exhibit 1-B-LA Dept of Ins Profiles of Member Companies)(aty,Tolbird, Grant)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #11 MOTION to Remand; MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand , MOTION for Attorney Fees by Ponthie Holdings L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Wilmore, Randall)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ponthie Holdings L L C. (aty,Wilmore, Randall)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States Aircraft Insurance Group. (aty,Tolbird, Grant)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc, Corporate Parent General Re Corp for United States Aviation Underwriters Inc. (aty,Tolbird, Grant)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Freeman Holdings of Louisiana L L C. (aty,Tolbird, Grant)
August 8, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding State Court Service Returned Executed. Action taken: Filed in Error, no return of service executed. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/6/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/6/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to W David Hammett, Grant Matthew Tolbird on behalf of Freeman Holdings of Louisiana L L C, United States Aircraft Insurance Group, United States Aviation Underwriters Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/19/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 2, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 2, 2019 FILE IN ERROR: STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. United States Aircraft Insurance Group, United States Aviation Underwriters In answer due 8/9/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M) Modified on 8/8/2019 to reflect no return of service executed.
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance by Freeman Holdings of Louisiana L L C, United States Aircraft Insurance Group, United States Aviation Underwriters Inc of Certificate of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) re #1 Notice of Removal (aty,Tolbird, Grant) Modified docket text on 8/5/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Rapides Parish, Case Number 265,596-E with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4015052) filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc, United States Aircraft Insurance Group, Freeman Holdings of Louisiana L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Suit Record (Rapides Parish), #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Grant Matthew Tolbird added to party Freeman Holdings of Louisiana L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Grant Matthew Tolbird added to party United States Aircraft Insurance Group(pty:dft), Attorney Grant Matthew Tolbird added to party United States Aviation Underwriters Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Tolbird, Grant) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/5/2019) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponthie Holdings L L C v. Freeman Holdings of Louisiana L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ponthie Holdings L L C
Represented By: Randall L Wilmore
Represented By: Connor Charles Headrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Aircraft Insurance Group
Represented By: Grant Matthew Tolbird
Represented By: W David Hammett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Aviation Underwriters Inc
Represented By: Grant Matthew Tolbird
Represented By: W David Hammett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Holdings of Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Grant Matthew Tolbird
Represented By: W David Hammett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?