Smith Segura & Rapheal L L P et al v. Brooks
Plaintiff: David P Smith, Smith Segura & Raphael L L P and David P Smith Attorney At Law L L C
Petitioner: David P Smith Attorney At Law LLC
Not Yet Classified: Smith Segura & Raphael LLP
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Brian D Brooks
3Rd Party Defendant: Smith Segura Raphael & Leger L L P, David C Raphael, Jr, Erin R Leger and Susan C Segura
Case Number: 1:2019cv01016
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 26(f) Report by Brian D Brooks, David P Smith Attorney At Law L L C, Erin R Leger, Susan C Segura, David C Raphael, Jr, Smith Segura & Raphael L L P, David P Smith. (aty,Pesnell, William) Modified on 10/2/2019 to add filers (Jones, P).
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #15 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 19-CV-01025. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,JonesSld, P)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 19-CV-01025 with consent by Brian D Brooks. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Pesnell, William) Modified on 9/27/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Erin R Leger. Erin R Leger waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Attorney B Gene Taylor, III added to party Erin R Leger(pty:3pd)) (aty,Taylor, B)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David C Raphael, Jr. David C Raphael, Jr waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Attorney B Gene Taylor, III added to party David C Raphael, Jr(pty:3pd)) (aty,Taylor, B)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Susan C Segura. Susan C Segura waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Attorney B Gene Taylor, III added to party Susan C Segura(pty:3pd)) (aty,Taylor, B)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Smith Segura & Raphael L L P. Smith Segura & Raphael L L P waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (aty,Taylor, B)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Brian D Brooks . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Attorneys, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of State Court Record (already filed), #3 Exhibit C - List of Documents filed in State Court and Date, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Counsel and Service)(aty,Pesnell, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Erin R Leger, David C Raphael, Jr, Susan C Segura, Smith Segura Raphael & Leger L L P. (crt,Whidden, C)
August 17, 2019 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Erin R Leger, David C Raphael, Jr, Susan C Segura, Smith Segura Raphael & Leger L L P filed by Brian D Brooks. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture Third Party Complaint. See #8 Answer and Counterclaim.(crt,Whidden, C)
August 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against David P Smith Attorney At Law L L C, David P Smith, Smith Segura & Raphael L L P by Brian D Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - RRB Notice 1, #4 Exhibit D - RRB Notice 2, #5 Exhibit E - 5/10/19 letter to RRB, #6 Exhibit F - Petition for Declaratory Judgment, #7 Exhibit G - Demand Letter)(aty,Pesnell, William) Modified on 8/19/2019 to remove duplicative text (Whidden, C).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Brian D Brooks answer due 8/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/13/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Brian D Brooks. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Pesnell, William) Modified on 8/12/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/8/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/8/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 6, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 6, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Brian D Brooks answer due 8/13/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brian D Brooks. (aty,Pesnell, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th Judicial District Court, Case Number 265445 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4017612) filed by Brian D Brooks. (Attachments: #1 State court petition State Court Petition Served on Brian Brooks, #2 State court petition Certified Copy of State Court Record, #3 Exhibit notice to adverse parties, #4 Proposed order proposed removal order)(Attorney William Alan Pesnell added to party Brian D Brooks(pty:dft))(aty,Pesnell, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith Segura & Rapheal L L P et al v. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David P Smith Attorney At Law LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Smith Segura & Raphael LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P Smith
Represented By: Charles S Weems, III
Represented By: B Gene Taylor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Segura & Raphael L L P
Represented By: Charles S Weems, III
Represented By: B Gene Taylor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P Smith Attorney At Law L L C
Represented By: Charles S Weems, III
Represented By: B Gene Taylor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Brian D Brooks
Represented By: William Alan Pesnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Smith Segura Raphael & Leger L L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: David C Raphael, Jr
Represented By: B Gene Taylor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Erin R Leger
Represented By: B Gene Taylor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Susan C Segura
Represented By: B Gene Taylor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?