Jalbert v. Leibold et al et al
Plaintiff: Craig Jalbert
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar, George Longo, Meranda Hyman, G P GmbH, Michael Leibold, Anna Kathrin Leibold, V O V GmbH and Peter Leibold
Case Number: 1:2019cv01069
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #35 MOTION to Sever Claims of Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 7, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support re #35 MOTION to Sever Claims of Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 filed by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar. (aty,Drell, Bradley)
October 7, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Sever Claims of Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc and Danyal Sattar. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (aty,Drell, Bradley) Modified filerson 10/8/2019 (Bunting, M).
October 7, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(aty,Drell, Bradley)
October 4, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #33 Consent MOTION to Stay re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Raymond James Defendants. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 4, 2019 Filing 33 Consent MOTION to Stay re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Raymond James Defendants by Craig Jalbert. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Burge, Jason) Modified to delete docket entry relationship on 10/4/2019 (Bunting, M).
October 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #27 MOTION to Dismiss Raymond James Defendants. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Degan Skylar Rosenbloom terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/2/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
October 1, 2019 Filing 30 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw D. Skylar Rosenbloom as Attorney by Craig Jalbert. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Rosenbloom, Degan)
October 1, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 30, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Drell, Bradley) Modified docket text on 10/1/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #28 for Proposed Pleading.
September 30, 2019 Filing 28 PROPOSED PLEADING - MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Raymond James Defendants filed by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed order)(aty,Drell, Bradley) Modified to reflect proposed pleading on 10/1/2019 (Bunting, M).
September 30, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Raymond James Defendants by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar. (aty,Brady, Michael)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rebecca Sha terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/19/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Jason W Burge,Alysson L Mills for Craig Jalbert,Jason W Burge,Alysson L Mills for Craig Jalbert,Jason W Burge,Alysson L Mills for Craig Jalbert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/18/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 18, 2019 Filing 24 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw Rebecca Sha as Attorney by Craig Jalbert. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Sha, Rebecca)
September 17, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Jason W. Burge and Alysson L. Mills to Enroll as Counsel by Craig Jalbert. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Veith, Rebekka)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #20 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 16, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Remand filed by Craig Jalbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Judgment Ordering Remand, #2 Exhibit 2, Report and Recommendations, #3 Exhibit 3, Assignments in globo)(aty,Veith, Rebekka)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand by Craig Jalbert. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (aty,Veith, Rebekka). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 9/16/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to add additional relief requested on 9/16/2019 (Bunting, M).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/2/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Serve for Appointment of a Special Process Server by Craig Jalbert. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Foss Baker, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Barriere, Brent)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER re #5 Removal Order by Bradley L Drell on behalf of George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar (aty,Drell, Bradley) Modified docket text to more accurately describe document filed on 8/26/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Joseph B Crace, Jr for George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, and Danyal Sattar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/23/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael A Brady for George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, and Danyal Sattar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/23/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Ryan R Baker for George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, and Danyal Sattar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/23/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Shepherd D Tate for George Longo,Shepherd D Tate for Raymond James & Associates Inc, Shepherd D Tate for Danyal Sattar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/23/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Amended Complaint, George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc. and Danyal Sattar answer due 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/21/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Joseph B. Crace, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4030588) by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rundell, Edward)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Michael A. Brady to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4030576) by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rundell, Edward)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Ryan R. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4030572) by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rundell, Edward)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Shepherd D. Tate to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4030548) by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rundell, Edward)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/20/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint with consent by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Drell, Bradley) Modified event to more accurately describe document filed on 8/20/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/19/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 16, 2019 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against G P GmbH, Meranda Hyman, Anna Kathrin Leibold, Michael Leibold, Peter Leibold, V O V GmbH filed by Craig Jalbert. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
August 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 15, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Peter Leibold, Anna Kathrin Leibold, Craig Jalbert, G P GmbH, V O V GmbH, Michael Leibold, COUNTERCLAIM against Peter Leibold, Anna Kathrin Leibold, Craig Jalbert, G P GmbH, V O V GmbH, Michael Leibold by Meranda Hyman. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Danyal Sattar of Disclosure Pursuant to Local Rule 3.1 (Attorney Bradley L Drell added to party George Longo(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley L Drell added to party Raymond James & Associates Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley L Drell added to party Danyal Sattar(pty:dft)) (aty,Drell, Bradley)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Raymond James & Associates Inc identifying Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates Inc. (aty,Rundell, Edward)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 28th JDC LaSalle Parish, Case Number 40802 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4025483) filed by Danyal Sattar, George Longo, Raymond James & Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Edward E Rundell added to party George Longo(pty:dft), Attorney Edward E Rundell added to party Raymond James & Associates Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Edward E Rundell added to party Danyal Sattar(pty:dft))(aty,Rundell, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jalbert v. Leibold et al et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates Inc
Represented By: Edward E Rundell
Represented By: Bradley L Drell
Represented By: Ryan R Baker
Represented By: Joseph B Crace, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Brady
Represented By: Shepherd D Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danyal Sattar
Represented By: Edward E Rundell
Represented By: Bradley L Drell
Represented By: Ryan R Baker
Represented By: Joseph B Crace, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Brady
Represented By: Shepherd D Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Longo
Represented By: Edward E Rundell
Represented By: Bradley L Drell
Represented By: Ryan R Baker
Represented By: Joseph B Crace, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Brady
Represented By: Shepherd D Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meranda Hyman
Represented By: Christie Clark Wood
Represented By: R Joseph Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G P GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Leibold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Kathrin Leibold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V O V GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Leibold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Jalbert
Represented By: Brent B Barriere
Represented By: Kristen Diane Amond
Represented By: Rebecca Sha
Represented By: Degan Skylar Rosenbloom
Represented By: Catherine Elena Lasky
Represented By: Walter E Dorroh, Jr
Represented By: Kerry A Murphy
Represented By: Rebekka C Veith
Represented By: Alysson L Mills
Represented By: Jason W Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?