Streete et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana
Plaintiff: Jon Streete, Lisa Streete and Lisa C Streete
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co and Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Louisiana
Case Number: 1:2019cv01088
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 ERISA CASE ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record (crt,Roaix, G)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co . (aty,Sherburne, Richard)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co.(aty,Sherburne, Richard) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct filer (Dauterive, C).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Louisiana answer due 9/16/2019; Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co answer due 9/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/27/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Sherburne, Richard) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct filer (Dauterive, C).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/22/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/21/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 19, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co. (aty,Sherburne, Richard) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct filer (Dauterive, C).
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 10th JDC Natchitoches Parish, Case Number 91269 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4027664) filed by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings Served on Defendant)(Attorney Richard A Sherburne, Jr added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana(pty:dft))(aty,Sherburne, Richard) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct filer (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streete et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana
Represented By: Richard A Sherburne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co
Represented By: Jessica Wainwright Chapman
Represented By: Richard A Sherburne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Louisiana
Represented By: Jessica Wainwright Chapman
Represented By: Richard A Sherburne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Streete
Represented By: Lisa Lanell Causey-Streete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Streete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa C Streete
Represented By: Lisa Lanell Causey-Streete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?