Giles v. Delta Defense L L C et al
Plaintiff: Kayla J Giles
Defendant: Delta Defense, LLC, United Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Co and Delta Defense L L C
Case Number: 1:2019cv01173
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint with consent by United Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Celeste D Elliott added to party United Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Elliott, Celeste)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delta Defense L L C. (aty,Clark, William)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #6 Response To Sua Sponte Jurisdictional Briefing Order filed by Kayla J Giles. IT IS ORDERED that Giles' request for additional time in which to conduct limited discovery (Doc. #6 ) is GRANTED. Giles has through December 6, 2019 to file her Jurisdictional Memorandum to properly show the citizenship of all parties (Compliance Deadline set for 12/6/2019.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Giles may conduct discovery at this time that is limited in scope to determining Defendants' citizenship. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/28/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Amended Complaint. Delta Defense L L C answer due 11/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/24/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to William Scarth Clark on behalf of Delta Defense L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/6/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Delta Defense L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney William Scarth Clark added to party Delta Defense L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Clark, William)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE To Sua Sponte Jurisdictional Briefing Order by Kayla J Giles re #4 Order . (aty,Willson, Thomas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Delta Defense L L C, United Specialty Insurance Co filed by Kayla J Giles.(aty,Willson, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/11/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 11/5/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Delta Defense L L C and United Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 6, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delta Defense L L C and United Specialty Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4043169) filed by Kayla J Giles. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Thomas Rockwell Willson added to party Kayla J Giles(pty:pla))(aty,Willson, Thomas) Modified on 9/9/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giles v. Delta Defense L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla J Giles
Represented By: Thomas Rockwell Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Defense, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Shaundra M Schudmak
Represented By: Celeste D Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Defense L L C
Represented By: William Scarth Clark
Represented By: Peter S Koeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?