Killian et al v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Killian and Brandy Banes
Defendant: Dean Anderson, Hanover Insurance Co and Centra Technology Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01220
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hanover Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents, T H G, Opus Investment Management Inc, Hanover Insurance Group Inc, for Hanover Insurance Co. (aty,Lavelle, Paul) Modified on 11/13/2019 to modify docket text and add filer. (Crick, S).
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Centra Technology Inc. (aty,Lavelle, Paul)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dean Anderson, Centra Technology Inc, Hanover Insurance Co.(aty,Lavelle, Paul) Modified on 11/13/2019 to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Dean Anderson answer due 11/15/2019; Centra Technology Inc answer due 11/15/2019; Hanover Insurance Co answer due 11/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/18/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Dean Anderson, Centra Technology Inc, Hanover Insurance Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Paul Michael Lavelle added to party Dean Anderson(pty:dft), Centra Technology Inc(pty:dft), Hanover Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Lavelle, Paul) Modified on 10/18/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 15, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Laura B Knoll on behalf of Brandy Banes, Jeffrey Killian regarding #6 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: Docket text modified to reflect correct service date of 9/27/2019 and answer due date 10/18/2019 as an incorrect service date was entered at the time of e-filing. (crt,Crick, S)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Killian, Brandy Banes. Hanover Insurance Co served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (aty,Knoll, Laura)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Killian, Brandy Banes. Centra Technology Inc served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (aty,Knoll, Laura) Modified on 10/15/2019 to correct service and answer deadlines as an erroneous service date was entered at the time of e-filing. (Crick, S).
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Killian, Brandy Banes. Dean Anderson served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (aty,Knoll, Laura)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/19/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 11/17/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dean Anderson, Centra Technology Inc, Hanover Insurance Co (crt,Crick, S)
September 18, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dean Anderson, Centra Technology Inc, Hanover Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4052273) filed by Jeffrey Killian, Brandy Banes. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Laura B Knoll added to party Brandy Banes(pty:selreq), Jeffrey Killian(pty:pla))(aty,Knoll, Laura) Modified on 9/18/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killian et al v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Killian
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Represented By: Eugene A Ledet, Jr
Represented By: Laura B Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Banes
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Represented By: Eugene A Ledet, Jr
Represented By: Laura B Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Anderson
Represented By: Sarah Perkins Reid
Represented By: Paul Michael Lavelle
Represented By: Christine Changho Bruneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Co
Represented By: Sarah Perkins Reid
Represented By: Paul Michael Lavelle
Represented By: Christine Changho Bruneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centra Technology Inc
Represented By: Sarah Perkins Reid
Represented By: Paul Michael Lavelle
Represented By: Christine Changho Bruneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?