Franklin v. Bordelon et al
Plaintiff: Terry Franklin
Defendant: James Longino, Troy Poret, Ashley C Firmin, Nikki Chenevert, Jude Pitre, Raymond Laborde Correctional Center, Diane Williams, Donnie Bordelon and Laura Desselle
Case Number: 1:2019cv01231
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 20, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00459. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/20/2019. (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Letter dated 09/13/2019 from Terry Franklin to Clerk of Court Re: Pirson Conditions (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Account by Terry Franklin. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of Account by Terry Franklin. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Donnie Bordelon, Nikki Chenevert, Laura Desselle, Ashley C. Firmin, James Longino, Jude Pitre, Troy Poret, Raymond Laborde Correctional Center, Diane Williams, filed by Terry Franklin.(KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #4 Letter of Deficiency, filed by Terry Franklin. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 Letter of Deficiency, filed by Terry Franklin. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2019. Filing Fee due by 9/9/2019. Statement of Account due by 9/9/2019. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
July 17, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENT MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Terry Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]. Application not on approved forms.
July 15, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
July 11, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Terry Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 envelope)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.] Application not on approved forms.
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Donnie Bordelon, Ashley C. Firmin and Raymond Laborde Correctional Center, filed by Terry Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 envelope)(EDC) Modified on 7/16/2019 to edit text. (EDC).[Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 9/20/2019.] Complaint not on approved forms.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Bordelon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Longino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Poret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley C Firmin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jude Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Laborde Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Desselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?