White v. City of Winnfield et al
Plaintiff: Tanisha White
Defendant: Piexon USA, Inc., Chief Johnny Ray Carpenter, Justin Curry, City of Winnfield, Chuck Curry, XYZ Insurance Company, John Doe and X Y Z Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2019cv01410
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 ELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Civil Case filing fee by Tanisha White. ( Filing Fee: $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4117796) . (aty,Haley, Ronald)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/12/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 12/29/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Johnny Ray Carpenter, Chuck Curry, Justin Curry, John Doe, City of Winnfield, X Y Z Insurance Co (crt,Jones, P)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Ronald S Haley on behalf of Tanisha White regarding #1 Complaint. Action taken: Modified to indicate Filed in Error as incorrect pdf attached. (crt,Jones, P)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against City of Winnfield, Justin Curry, Chuck Curry, Chief Johnny Ray Carpenter, John Doe, X Y Z Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4097928) filed by Tanisha White.(aty,Haley, Ronald) Modified on 11/8/2019 to edit text and indicate SEE Document #1 for Civil Cover Sheet (Jones, P).
October 30, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Jones, P)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 FILED IN ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Tanisha White. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Ronald S Haley added to party Tanisha White(pty:pla))(aty,Haley, Ronald) Modified on 11/8/2019 to indicate filed in error, wrong pdf attached (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. City of Winnfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanisha White
Represented By: Ronald S Haley
Represented By: Jordan L Bollinger
Represented By: Lance C Unglesby
Represented By: Christopher James Murell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piexon USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Johnny Ray Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Winnfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?