Smith v. U S P Pollock
Plaintiff: Cedric J Smith
Defendant: Warden U S P Pollock
Case Number: 1:2019cv01470
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IT IS RECOMMENDED that re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Cedric J Smith be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction with prejudice as to the jurisdictional issue and without prejudice as to the merits of the claim. Objections to R&R due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/7/2020. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 19, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Cedric J Smith in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635062977. (crt,Adams, K)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 12/16/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(crt,Thomas, T)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/14/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 12, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Cedric J Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. U S P Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden U S P Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?