Sumera v. Warden
Plaintiff: David Sumera
Defendant: Warden U S P Pollock
Case Number: 1:2019cv01528
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/4/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
November 27, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12463. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Supplement to #3 Petition Pursuant to 28:2241 by David Sumera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION Requesting Permission to Supplement Petition. FURTHER ORDERED that Case transferred to Western District of Louisiana. (CC: David Sumera). Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 11/25/19.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Requesting Permission to Supplement Ground Two to Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241 Pursuant to Frd. Civ. P. Rule 15(d); in Alternative, Grant Writ by David Sumera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A)(mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 Reply by David Sumera to #8 Government's Memorandum in Opposition to Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2241. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Memorandum. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Response/Memorandum in Opposition. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record as to Brittany Reed. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 10/18/19. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Response/Memorandum in Opposition by Warden re #3 Petition Pursuant to 28:2241 (Reed, Brittany) Modified text/event on 10/18/2019 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record. **Document does not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate 5.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Brittany Reed by Warden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Brittany LaShaune Reed added to party Warden(pty:dft).(Reed, Brittany) Modified text on 10/17/2019 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service of application and Order at rec. doc. 4 served on Peter Strasser on 9/19/2019.(mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court serve, by certified mail, a copy of the application and this Order on the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Louisiana. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Louisiana file with this Court on or before October 18, 2019, an answer containing a written statement of the Governments position as to petitioner's application and a list of citations of authorities upon which the Government relies. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/16/2019.(am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (am). (Mailed copy to plaintiff via USPS and Certified mail to US Attorney) Modified on 9/18/2019 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION Pursuant to 28:2241 filed by David Sumera. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Petition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing fee paid re #1 Petition Pursuant to 28:2241 (Filing fee $ 5). (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition Pursuant to 28:2241. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/27/2019. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: PETITION Pursuant to 28:2241 filed by David Sumera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sumera v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sumera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden U S P Pollock
Represented By: Brittany LaShaune Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?