Valentine v. International Paper Co et al
Plaintiff: John Valentine
Defendant: International Paper Company, Old Republic Insurance Company, International Paper Co and Old Republic Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2020cv00423
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #11 PROPOSED Plan of Work. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Williams, L)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED Plan of Work by John Valentine, Old Republic Insurance Co, International Paper Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Gralapp, Wesley) Modified on 6/4/2020 to change event and add filers (Williams, L).
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by International Paper Co, Old Republic Insurance Co . (aty,Smith, Lea)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Republic Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic General Insurance Group Inc, Other Affiliate Old Republic International Corporation for Old Republic Insurance Co. (aty,Smith, Lea)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Paper Co. (aty,Smith, Lea)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by International Paper Co, Old Republic Insurance Co.(aty,Smith, Lea)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/7/2020. (crt,Roaix, G)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/7/2020. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 6/5/2020.)(crt,Roaix, G)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/6/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Lea Ann Smith, Allena B McCain on behalf of International Paper Company, Old Republic Insurance Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/20/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 6, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 6, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. International Paper Co, Old Republic Insurance Company answer due 4/13/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 28th JDC LaSalle Parish, Case Number 41708 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4227740) filed by Old Republic Insurance Company, International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Lea Ann Smith added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lea Ann Smith added to party Old Republic Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Smith, Lea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. International Paper Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Valentine
Represented By: Wesley J Gralapp
Represented By: Matthew J Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Allena B McCain
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Allena B McCain
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Co
Represented By: Allena B McCain
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Co
Represented By: Allena B McCain
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?