Atemafac et al v. Witte et al
Petitioner: Odlanier Reyes Mieres, Fogap Ivo Atemafac, Erick Perez Carpio, Yannick Alpha Ndelela, Alien Castillo Gonzalez, Bertrand Atenekara Awanaya, Paulinus Doh Ndungmbowo, Priso Dalle Durchien and Hyson Sama Moma
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Diane Witte, Tony H Pham, Shad Rice, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement and Eric Staiger
Case Number: 1:2020cv01369
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the claims of Fogap Ivo Atemafac, Bertrand Atenekara Awanaya, Alien Castillo Gonzalez, Priso Dalle Durchien, Hyson Sama Moma, Yannick, Alpha Ndelela, Paulinus Doh Ndungmbowo, Erick Perez Carpio and Odlanier Reyes Mieres LIPC are severed and transferred to the Alexandria Division of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/21/2020. (For PDF image, see document #5 in case 6:20-cv-1320.)(crt,Haik, K)
October 21, 2020 Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes added. Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna and Judge Robert R Summerhays no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Haik, K)
October 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Expedite. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/9/2020. (crt,Haik, K)
October 9, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Haik, K)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Fogap Ivo Atemafac, Bertrand Atenekara Awanaya, Alien Castillo Gonzalez, Priso Dalle Durchien, Hyson Sama Moma, Yannick Alpha Ndelela, Paulinus Doh Ndungmbowo, Erick Perez Carpio, Odlanier Reyes Mieres. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Affidavit Second Vogel Decl., #4 Affidavit Perez Carpio Suppl. Decl., #5 Affidavit Awanayah Suppl. Decl., #6 Affidavit Castillo Gonzalez Suppl. Decl., #7 Affidavit Reyes Mieres Suppl. Decl., #8 Affidavit Durchien Suppl. Decl., #9 Affidavit Ndungmbowo Suppl. Decl., #10 Affidavit Ndelela Suppl. Decl., #11 Affidavit Moma Suppl. Decl., #12 Affidavit Atemafac Suppl. Decl.)(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Limited Expedited Discovery by Marius Agba Ache, Michael Atembeshu, Albert Njenda Njomeni, Stephen Oman. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Affidavit Vogel Decl., #4 Affidavit Niyogi Decl., #5 Affidavit Ache Suppl. Decl., #6 Affidavit Njomeni Suppl. Decl., #7 Affidavit Oman Suppl. Decl., #8 Affidavit Awanayah Decl., #9 Affidavit Castillo Gonzalez Decl., #10 Affidavit Ache Decl., #11 Affidavit Reyes Mieres Decl., #12 Affidavit Ndelela Decl., #13 Affidavit Njomeni Decl., #14 Affidavit Atembeshu Decl., #15 Affidavit Ndungmbowo Decl., #16 Affidavit Moma Decl., #17 Affidavit Durchien Decl., #18 Affidavit Oman Decl., #19 Affidavit Atemafac Decl., #20 Affidavit Perez Carpio Decl., #21 Affidavit Njuguna Suppl. Decl., #22 Affidavit Njuguna Decl.)(aty,Vogel, Matthew). Added MOTION to Expedite on 10/13/2020 (Haik, K).
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Diane Witte, Tony H Pham, Chad Wolf, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Eric Staiger, Shad Rice. (crt,Devillier, W)
October 8, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Devillier, W)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number ALAWDC-4417202) filed by Paulinus Doh Ndungmbowo, Alien Castillo Gonzalez, Michael Atembeshu, Marius Agba Ache, Odlanier Reyes Mieres, Bertrand Atenekara Awanaya, Albert Njenda Njomeni, Hyson Sama Moma, Erick Perez Carpio, Priso Dalle Durchien, Stephen Oman, Yannick Alpha Ndelela, Fogap Ivo Atemafac. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Marius Agba Ache(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Fogap Ivo Atemafac(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Michael Atembeshu(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Bertrand Atenekara Awanaya(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Alien Castillo Gonzalez(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Priso Dalle Durchien(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Hyson Sama Moma(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Yannick Alpha Ndelela(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Paulinus Doh Ndungmbowo(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Albert Njenda Njomeni(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Stephen Oman(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Erick Perez Carpio(pty:pet), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Odlanier Reyes Mieres(pty:pet))(aty,Vogel, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atemafac et al v. Witte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diane Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tony H Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shad Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Staiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Odlanier Reyes Mieres
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fogap Ivo Atemafac
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erick Perez Carpio
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yannick Alpha Ndelela
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alien Castillo Gonzalez
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bertrand Atenekara Awanaya
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paulinus Doh Ndungmbowo
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Priso Dalle Durchien
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hyson Sama Moma
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?