Barras v. Saul
Plaintiff: KRIS MICHAEL BARRAS
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01670
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Crick, S)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/8/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
January 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/29/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 2, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/2/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency to Adam Meunier on behalf of Kris Michael Barras regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #1 Complaint. Reason: The documents were signed by an attorney not admitted to practice before this court. (crt,Crick, S)
December 21, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kris Michael Barras. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit)(aty,Meunier, Adam) Modified on 12/22/2020 to modify docket text and indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 12/29/2020 to remove deficient status as attorney is now admitted(Miletello, A).
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Kris Michael Barras. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 SUMMONS, #3 SUMMONS, #4 SUMMONS)(Attorney Adam Meunier added to party Kris Michael Barras(pty:pla))(aty,Meunier, Adam) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/22/2020 to replace fillable form.) (Crick, S). Modified on 12/22/2020 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 12/29/2020 to remove deficient status as attorney is now admitted (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barras v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRIS MICHAEL BARRAS
Represented By: Adam Meunier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?