Lama v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Sherpa Pasang Lama
Defendant: Chad Wolf, Dianne Witte, I C E, Shad Rice and Tony H Pham
Case Number: 1:2021cv00181
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Sherpa Pasang Lama re #11 Memorandum Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 JUDGMENT adopting #12 Report and Recommendations denying #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 3/3/2021. (crt,Roaix, G)
March 2, 2021 ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sherpa Pasang Lama. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/2/2021. (crt,Roaix, G)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IT IS RECOMMENDED that re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sherpa Pasang Lama be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/12/2021. (crt,Roaix, G)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint/petition. Pro Se Response due by 3/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/10/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #8 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/10/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER mooting #3 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/10/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite by Sherpa Pasang Lama. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Signed Signature Page of Petition filed by Sherpa Pasang Lama regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
January 25, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Sherpa Pasang Lama in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635065151. (crt,Adams, K)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to sign complaint/petition. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 2/24/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page of 2241 form)(crt,Taylor, L)
January 23, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/23/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/22/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
January 21, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite by Sherpa Pasang Lama. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sherpa Pasang Lama. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/22/2021) (Miletello, A).
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 DEFICIENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sherpa Pasang Lama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2021: #3 Civil cover sheet) (Miletello, A). Petition not signed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lama v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I C E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shad Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony H Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherpa Pasang Lama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?