Jacques et al v. Baker Hughes, a G E Co L L C et al
Plaintiff: Amber Corley Delgadillo, Andree Renee Jacques, Esteven Delgadillo and Michael Cooper Thornhill
Defendant: GHD Services, Inc., Dresser, Inc., Stantec Consulting Services, Inc., Baker-Hughes, A GE Company, Baker Hughes Energy Services, LLC, Dresser RE, LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., State of Louisiana Through the Department of Environmental Quality, GE Oil & Gas, LLC, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C, Dresser R E L L C, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Halliburton Energy Services Inc, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, LA Dept of Environmental Quality, Stantec Consulting Services Inc, G H D Services Inc and Dresser L L C
Case Number: 1:2021cv00315
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C. (aty,Bryant, Mitchell)
March 29, 2021 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' claim for fraud, ill practices, and misrepresentation MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Stantec Consulting Services Inc. (aty,Patrick, William)
March 24, 2021 Filing 36 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/24/2021. The matter is taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: VTC) (crt,Tice, Y)
March 24, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Anthony J. Hebert and Kenneth Jay DeLouche to Enroll as Counsel by Andree Renee Jacques. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order)(aty,Auzenne, Stacy)
March 23, 2021 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' claim for fraud, ill practices, and misrepresentation MOTION for More Definite Statement, #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, #8 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Amber Corley Delgadillo, Michael Cooper Thornhill, Andree Renee Jacques, Esteven Delgadillo. (Attachments: #1 Order)(aty,Auzenne, Stacy) Modified on 3/23/2021 (Thomas, T).
March 23, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Deficiency to Stacy C Auzenne on behalf of Amber Corley Delgadillo, Esteven Delgadillo, Andree Renee Jacques, Michael Cooper Thornhill regarding #31 MOTION for Anthony J. Hebert and Kenneth Jay DeLouche to Enroll as Counsel . Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. (crt,Thomas, T)
March 22, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Compliance by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C, G H D Services Inc, Halliburton Energy Services Inc, Stantec Consulting Services Inc re #24 Minute Entry,,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Coordination Plan, #2 Exhibit 2-Proposed Plaintiff Information Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3-Proposed Medical Authorization, #4 Exhibit 4-Proposed Employment Authorization, #5 Exhibit 5-Form SSA-7050, #6 Exhibit 6-Details of Conferences, #7 Exhibit 7-Memorandum of Law)(aty,Bryant, Mitchell)
March 22, 2021 Filing 31 DEFICIENT MOTION for Anthony J. Hebert and Kenneth Jay DeLouche to Enroll as Counsel by Amber Corley Delgadillo, Michael Cooper Thornhill, Andree Renee Jacques, Esteven Delgadillo. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/22/2021. (aty,Auzenne, Stacy) Modified to reflect deficient status and to add filers on 3/23/2021 (Thomas, T).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Craig Andrew Stanfield for Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Tracie Jo Renfroe for Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mitchell Blake Bryant for Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 16, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608670) by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Tracie Jo Renfroe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608664) by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608657) by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 12, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY: A STATUS CONFERENCE is set for 03/24/2021 AT 10:00 A.M. via video teleconference before Mag. Judge Perez-Montes. All attendance at this hearing will be by video conference. An email with the access link will be sent the day prior to the hearing. All counsel of record are responsible for sharing access information with represented parties, witnesses, or other persons associated with parties or witnesses that wish to attend. Participants are reminded of requirements of our local rules with respect to proper attire in the courtroom. They are to abide by those requirements even when participating via teleconference. Compliance Deadline set for 3/22/2021.The public is welcome to participate via video conference and may send an email request to JPM_VTC@lawd.uscourts.gov to request access information. The access will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Those who are granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanction deemed necessary by the Court. The public is also reminded that silence must be observed by all audience members and any public outbursts will be met with immediate removal of video and audio feed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/12/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 4, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #22 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' claim for fraud, ill practices, and misrepresentation MOTION for More Definite Statement. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Thomas, T)
March 4, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' claim for fraud, ill practices, and misrepresentation by Stantec Consulting Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Campbell, John). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 3/4/2021 (Thomas, T).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's have a two-week extension on each of the current deadlines file am motion to remand and file responses to pending motion to dismiss by defendants #8 and #16 . Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 3/3/2021. (crt,Roaix, G)
March 2, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with consent sought but not yet obtained by Andree Renee Jacques. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Order)(aty,Auzenne, Stacy)
March 2, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with consent sought but not yet obtained . Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Thomas, T)
March 1, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by G H D Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent G H D Holdigns (U S), L L C for G H D Services Inc. (aty,Zimmer, Scott) Modified docket text on 3/1/2021 (Bunting, M).
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of J Scott Janoe for Halliburton Energy Services Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/26/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 24, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 23, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin) Modified on 2/24/2021 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for J. Scott Janoe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4581125) by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin)
February 22, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C identifying Corporate Parents, G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I, Inc, Baker Hughes Co, E H H C NewCo L L C, Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Holdings L L C for Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C; Corporate Parent Dresser L L C for Dresser R E L L C; Corporate Parents, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C for Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C; Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C for G E Oil & Gas L L C. (aty,Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 2/22/2021 to modify docket text and add filer. (Crick, S).
February 22, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Dresser L L C answer due 2/19/2021; Dresser R E L L C answer due 2/19/2021; LA Dept of Environmental Quality answer due 2/18/2021; G E Oil & Gas L L C answer due 2/19/2021; G H D Services Inc answer due 2/19/2021; Halliburton Energy Services Inc answer due 2/23/2021; Stantec Consulting Services Inc answer due 3/5/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #2 to #14 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Stantec Consulting Services Inc answer due 3/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/19/2021. (crt,Roaix, G)
February 18, 2021 Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Stantec Consulting Services Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Campbell, John)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for More Definite Statement, sent to Megan L Reinkemeyer, Scott L Zimmer on behalf of G H D Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/2/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, #8 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for More Definite Statement. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim and Rule 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement by G H D Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Zimmer, Scott). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 2/16/2021 (Thomas, T).
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Mustang Acquisition Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Stantec Technology International Inc, Corporate Parent Stantec Inc by Stantec Consulting Services Inc. (aty,Campbell, John) Modified to add corporate parents on 2/10/2021 (Thomas, T).
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 2/10/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Halliburton Energy Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Halliburton Co, Corporate Parent Halliburton Holdings L L C for Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/8/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrew M Stakelum on behalf of Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/22/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 5, 2021 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by G H D Services Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 5, 2021 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #3 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 5, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 5, 2021 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Stantec Consulting Services Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #4 to document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Parish of Rapides, Case Number 269,748 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4563762) filed by Baker Hughes Energy Services, LLC, Dresser, Inc., GE Oil & Gas, LLC, Dresser RE, LLC, Baker-Hughes, A GE Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes Energy Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker-Hughes, A GE Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Dresser RE, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Dresser, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party GE Oil & Gas, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacques et al v. Baker Hughes, a G E Co L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHD Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stantec Consulting Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker-Hughes, A GE Company
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser RE, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana Through the Department of Environmental Quality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Oil & Gas, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E Oil & Gas L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser R E L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Louis E Layrisson, III
Represented By: J Scott Janoe
Represented By: Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin
Represented By: Charles S Weems, III
Represented By: Stephen A LaFleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Holdings L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Environmental Quality
Represented By: Patrick Bayard McIntire
Represented By: Lawrence E Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stantec Consulting Services Inc
Represented By: Edward Daniel Hughes
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: William Hardy Patrick, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G H D Services Inc
Represented By: Scott L Zimmer
Represented By: Megan L Reinkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Corley Delgadillo
Represented By: Stacy C Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andree Renee Jacques
Represented By: Stacy C Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteven Delgadillo
Represented By: Stacy C Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cooper Thornhill
Represented By: Stacy C Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?