Tanyike v. Mayorkas
Plaintiff: Henry Tanyike
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 1:2021cv00493
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT adopting #6 Report and Recommendations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 [ECF No. 1] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David C. Joseph on 4/21/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
April 14, 2021 ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Henry Tanyike. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/16/2021. (crt,Roaix, G)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Henry Tanyike, Winn Parish Correctional Center, 180 CCA Blvd, Winnfield, LA 71483 re: #6 Report and Recommendations returned marked: RTS. Released - bonded out. (crt,Dunford, T)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Henry Tanyike - Because the Court lacks jurisdiction, IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Petition (ECF No. 1) be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 4/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/31/2021. (crt,Tice, Y) (a)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Signed Signature Page of Petition filed by Henry Tanyike regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to sign complaint/petition. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 4/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page of 2241 form)(crt,Taylor, L)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/1/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/1/2021. (crt,Devillier, W) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/1/2021) (Devillier, W).
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 54635065285, filing fee $5) filed by Henry Tanyike. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A). Petition not signed. Modified to remove deficient status on 3/19/2021 (Thomas, T).
February 22, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Taylor, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanyike v. Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Tanyike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?