Cook et al v. Dresser L L C et al
Plaintiff: Alyssa Cook, Robert Cook and Julia Cook
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services, LLC, Dresser RE, LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Baker Hughes Company, Dresser, LLC, Dresser R E L L C, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Co, Halliburton Energy Services Inc and Dresser L L C
Case Number: 1:2021cv00696
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: David C Joseph
2 Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jacob Scott Janoe for Halliburton Energy Services Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/7/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 6, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Scott Janoe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4664588) by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Janoe, Jacob) Modified on 5/6/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Halliburton Energy Services Inc answer due 5/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 4/30/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
April 29, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Layrisson, Louis) Modified on 4/29/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Halliburton Energy Services Inc answer due 4/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 4/15/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
April 9, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
April 9, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(Attorney Louis E Layrisson, III added to party Halliburton Energy Services Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Layrisson, Louis)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Pre-Certification Discovery ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 4/8/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
April 5, 2021 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding (33 in 1:20-cv-00631-DCJ-JPM, 16 in 1:21-cv-00696-DCJ-JPM, 14 in 1:20-cv-01292-DCJ-JPM, 45 in 1:20-cv-01460-DCJ-JPM, 24 in 1:21-cv-00142-DCJ-JPM, 15 in 1:20-cv-01293-DCJ-JPM, 88 in 1:20-cv-01174-DCJ-JPM, 40 in 1:21-cv-00315-DCJ-JPM) Order,. Action taken: Modified docket text to indicate filed in error. (crt,Crick, S)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FILED IN ERROR. ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties in all Related Cases comply with the following deadlines and instructions regarding pre-certification discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/5/2021. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 4/8/2021 to indicate filed in error. (Crick, S).
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C identifying Corporate Parent Dresser, LLC for Dresser R E L L C; Corporate Parent GE Oil & Gas US Holdings I, Inc, Corporate Parent Baker Hughes Company, Corporate Parent EHHC NewCo LLC, Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Holdings L L C for Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C. (aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/24/2021. The matter is taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: VTC) (crt,Tice, Y)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Joseph. Judge Dee D Drell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 3/23/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Craig Andrew Stanfield for Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/22/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Tracie Jo Renfroe for Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/22/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mitchell Blake Bryant for Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/22/2021. (crt,Jones, P) Modified on 3/23/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of of Compliance by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C re #2 Memorandum Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 3/23/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/22/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrew M Stakelum, Eric E Jarrell, Robert J Burvant, Michael J Cerniglia on behalf of Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/2/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/19/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4613114) by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Tracie Jo Renfroe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4613108) by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4613098) by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER - A Status Conference is set for 3/24/2021 at 10:00 AM, by video conference, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes. A separate email with the link access will be sent prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/18/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Parish of Rapides, Case Number 270088 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4608865) filed by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser R E L L C, Dresser L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 3/16/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
March 16, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Jones, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook et al v. Dresser L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser RE, LLC
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Company
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser, LLC
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser R E L L C
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Co
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Jacob Scott Janoe
Represented By: Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin
Represented By: Charles S Weems, III
Represented By: Louis E Layrisson, III
Represented By: Stephen A LaFleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser L L C
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Cook
Represented By: Ronald C Richard
Represented By: Steven P Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cook
Represented By: Ronald C Richard
Represented By: Steven P Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Cook
Represented By: Ronald C Richard
Represented By: Steven P Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?