Camacho v. Alexandria Staging Center - G E O
Defendant: Alexandria Staging Center - G E O
Petitioner: Luis Enrique Pineda Camacho
Case Number: 1:2021cv01828
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/30/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
June 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #2 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 6/26/2021. (jud,Joseph, David)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Alexandria Staging Center - G E O. (crt,Devillier, W)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/24/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:21-cv-01520. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Alexandria Division, for all further proceedings. The clerk must immediately forward the file to that court and close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 6/24/2021. (SRC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/24/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-1520-TPB-JSS. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/24/2021.]
June 24, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
June 23, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/24/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Frank John Bane, Luis Enrique Pineda Camcho. (Bane, Frank) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/24/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AFLMDC-18398055) filed by Luis Enrique Pineda Camcho, Frank John Bane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bane, Frank) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camacho v. Alexandria Staging Center - G E O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Staging Center - G E O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Enrique Pineda Camacho
Represented By: Frank John Bane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?