Petty et al v. Dresser L L C et al
Plaintiff: Betsy E. Petty, Charles Baun, William Guyon, Juanita Guyon, Wilmer E Penton, Ruby Robinson Penton, Roger Coleman, Georgeann Carderara, James Owens, Betinna Owens, Naomi Wieters, Robert Wieters, Linda B Roberts, Barbara F Yates, Wayne C Lallman, Loretta Simms, Marvin Simms, CJ Coupe, LLC, Raimon Williams, Wanda Coleman, Betsy E Petty, Ruby Robison Penton, Bettina Owens, Barbara Faye Yates, C J Coupe L L C and Joel R Penton
Defendant: Dresser, LLC, Dresser RE, LLC, Baker Hughes Company, Baker Hughes Energy Services, LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Dresser L L C, Dresser Inc, Dresser Industries Inc, Dresser R E L L C, Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C and Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv02586
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C answer due 8/25/2021; Dresser L L C answer due 8/25/2021; Dresser R E L L C answer due 8/25/2021; Halliburton Energy Services Inc answer due 8/25/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 TO #14 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER. (crt,Jones, P)
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, Halliburton Energy Services Inc with Jury Demand filed by Naomi Wieters, Roger Coleman, Marvin Simms, Charles Baun, Betsy E Petty, C J Coupe L L C, Loretta Simms, Linda B Roberts, William Guyon, James Owens, Robert Wieters, Barbara Faye Yates, Wanda Coleman, Wayne C Lallman, Georgeann Carderara, Juanita Guyon, Raimon Williams, Bettina Owens, Joel R Penton.(Attorney Andrew John Cvitanovic added to party Joel R Penton(pty:pla))(crt,Jones, P)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/16/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jacob Scott Janoe for Halliburton Energy Services Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/10/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Complaint with consent sought but not yet obtained by Charles Baun, C J Coupe L L C, Georgeann Carderara, Roger Coleman, Wanda Coleman, Juanita Guyon, William Guyon, Wayne C Lallman, Bettina Owens, James Owens, Ruby Robison Penton, Wilmer E Penton, Betsy E Petty, Linda B Roberts, Loretta Simms, Marvin Simms, Naomi Wieters, Robert Wieters, Raimon Williams, Barbara Faye Yates. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Cvitanovic, Andrew) Modified on 9/10/2021 to capture more accurate event (Jones, P).
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency to Andrew John Cvitanovic on behalf of Charles Baun, C J Coupe L L C, Georgeann Carderara, Roger Coleman, Wanda Coleman, Juanita Guyon, William Guyon, Wayne C Lallman, Bettina Owens, James Owens, Ruby Robison Penton, Wilmer E Penton, Betsy E Petty, Linda B Roberts, Loretta Simms, Marvin Simms, Naomi Wieters, Robert Wieters, Raimon Williams, Barbara Faye Yates regarding #8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint with consent sought but not yet obtained . Reason: The document is not on letter-size paper as required by LR10.1. Please re-submit this document in proper form. (crt,Jones, P)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 DEFICIENT MOTION to Amend Complaint by Charles Baun, C J Coupe L L C, Georgeann Carderara, Roger Coleman, Wanda Coleman, Juanita Guyon, William Guyon, Wayne C Lallman, Bettina Owens, James Owens, Ruby Robison Penton, Wilmer E Penton, Betsy E Petty, Linda B Roberts, Loretta Simms, Marvin Simms, Naomi Wieters, Robert Wieters, Raimon Williams, Barbara Faye Yates. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Cvitanovic, Andrew) Modified on 9/10/2021 to capture more accurate event and indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 9/10/2021 to indicate refiled in its entirety as Document #10 (Jones, P).
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for J. Scott Janoe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4810433) by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(Attorney Jacob Scott Janoe added to party Halliburton Energy Services Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Janoe, Jacob)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C identifying Corporate Parent Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, General Electric Co, Corporate Parent GE Oil & Gas US Holdings I, Inc., Corporate Parent EHHC NewCO LLC, Corporate Parent Baker Hughes Company for Dresser L L C; Corporate Parent Dresser, LLC for Dresser R E L L C; Corporate Parent Baker Hughes Holdings L L C for Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C. (aty,Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 8/27/2021 to add corporate parent (Jones, P).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 8/24/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Halliburton Energy Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Halliburton Co, Corporate Parent Halliburton Holdings L L C for Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (aty,Layrisson, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrew M Stakelum on behalf of Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/3/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 18, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 18, 2021 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in attachment #2 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Parish of Rapides, Case Number 271,169F with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4781419) filed by Dresser, LLC, Dresser RE, LLC, Baker Hughes Company, Baker Hughes Energy Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes Energy Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Dresser RE, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Dresser, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petty et al v. Dresser L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy E. Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Baun
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Guyon
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Guyon
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmer E Penton
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Robinson Penton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Coleman
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgeann Carderara
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Owens
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betinna Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Wieters
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wieters
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda B Roberts
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara F Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne C Lallman
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Simms
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Simms
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CJ Coupe, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raimon Williams
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Coleman
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy E Petty
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Robison Penton
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettina Owens
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Faye Yates
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C J Coupe L L C
Represented By: Philip F Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Christina Marie Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Beck, III
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel R Penton
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser RE, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Company
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser Inc
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser Industries Inc
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser R E L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Co
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Louis E Layrisson, III
Represented By: Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin
Represented By: Charles S Weems, III
Represented By: Jacob Scott Janoe
Represented By: Stephen A LaFleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?