Harris v. City of Alexandria Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Linda Faye Harris
Defendant: City of Alexandria Housing Authority
Case Number: 1:2021cv03182
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 the Joint Stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant, The Housing Authority of the City of Alexandria, pay all court costs. The suit is otherwise DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 9/27/2021. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 24, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT STIPULATION by Linda Faye Harris, City of Alexandria Housing Authority. (aty,McClatchey, Walter) Modified on 9/24/2021 to capture motion event, to add filer and indicate proposed order contained within pdf of main document (Miletello, A).
September 24, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #19 Joint Stipulation. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 EXHIBIT LIST. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 - 4, #2 Defendant's Exhibit 1 - 10)(crt,Roaix, G)
September 15, 2021 Filing 17 WITNESS LIST filed (restricted access). (crt,Roaix, G)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Dee D Drell: taking under advisement #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; MOTION HEARING held on 9/15/2021 re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Linda Faye Harris. Compliance Deadline set for 9/25/2021. (Court Reporter: Myra Primeaux) (crt,Roaix, G)
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction served on Stephan Fontenot on 9/7/21, filed by Linda Faye Harris. (aty,McClatchey, Walter) Modified docket text on 9/7/2021 (Miletello, A).
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Faye Harris. City of Alexandria Housing Authority served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (aty,McClatchey, Walter)
September 3, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS REISSUED as to City of Alexandria Housing Authority. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 2, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of Alexandria Housing Authority. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/2/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #5 Motion for TRO. The motion for preliminary injunction is set for hearing, via ZOOM Video Conference on 9/15/21 at 1:30 p.m. The Court requires no bond in conjunction with #7 Motion for Bond. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 9/1/2021. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER WITHDRAWING re #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Linda Faye Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/1/2021. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **WITHDRAWN** REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IT IS RECOMMENDED that re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Linda Faye Harris be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/1/2021. (crt,Roaix, G) Modified on 9/1/2021 (Roaix, G) See order withdrawing R&R 9 .
September 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion day set for 9/15/2021 01:30 PM in by video conference before Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 31, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Bond by Linda Faye Harris. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2021. (aty,McClatchey, Walter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 ENDORSEMENT/CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Walter P McClatchey, Jr on behalf of Linda Faye Harris (aty,McClatchey, Walter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Linda Faye Harris. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2021. (aty,McClatchey, Walter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Linda Faye Harris. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2021. (aty,McClatchey, Walter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Linda Faye Harris. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2021. (aty,McClatchey, Walter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Linda Faye Harris. (aty,McClatchey, Walter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Alexandria Housing Authority (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Linda Faye Harris.(Attorney Walter P McClatchey, Jr added to party Linda Faye Harris(pty:pla))(aty,McClatchey, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. City of Alexandria Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Faye Harris
Represented By: Walter P McClatchey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alexandria Housing Authority
Represented By: Lewis O Lauve, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?