Vintage Realty Co L L C et al v. Certain Underwriters Lloyds London et al
Plaintiff: Vintage Realty Co, Magnolia Trace Apartment Homes, LLC, Vintage Realty Co L L C and Magnolia Trace Apartment Homes L L C
Defendant: Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, United Specialty Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, HDI Global Specialty SE, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co and H D I Global Specialty S E
Case Number: 1:2021cv04298
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall notify the Court of the date the mediation is scheduled and inform the Court of the outcome of such mediation. If mediation has not occurred within ninety (90) days of this Order, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report showing good cause. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 1/20/2022. (crt,Roaix, G)
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Continue Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified docket text on 1/19/2022 (Miletello, A).
January 19, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Continue Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 29, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents X L Bermuda Ltd (Bermuda), X L I T Ltd (Cayman), X L Group Ltd (Bermuda), Exel Holding Ltd (Cayman), Other Affiliates X L Specialty Insurance Co, X L Reinsurance America Inc (New York), X L America Inc (Delaware) for Indian Harbor Insurance Co; Corporate Parents American International Group Inc, Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd, Axis Capital Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine Holdings Inc, Enstar Group Ltd, Hannover Re, Hiscox Ltd, Talanx A G, Sompo Holdings Inc, Kenmare Holdings Ltd, Brit Insurance Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine Kiln Group Ltd, Argenta Holdings Ltd, Hannover Ruck S E, Haftpflichtverband der Deutschen Industrie V a G, Asta Capital Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Holdings Ltd, Exor Nederland N V, Beasley p l c, Q B E Insurance, Lancashire Holdings Ltd, Shelbourne Group Ltd, Cathedral Capital Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine & Nichido Insurance Co Ltd, Other Affiliates Talbot Underwriting Ltd, Brit Syndicates Ltd, Brit Syndicates Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Ltd, Q B E Underwriting Ltd, Brit U W Ltd, Vanguard Group, Argenta Syndicate Management Ltd, Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicates Ltd, Asta Managing Agency Ltd, S G L No 1 Ltd, T Rowe Price, Apollo Syndicate Management Ltd, Apollo Partners L L P, D C B Ibeson, S A C White, Hiscox Syndicates Ltd, Catlin Syndicate Ltd, Inter Hannover (No 1) Ltd, PartnerRe Corporate Ltd, PartnerRe Ltd, S C O R Underwriting Ltd, S A Meacock & Co Ltd, Lancashire Syndicates Ltd, Atrium Underwriting Group Ltd, Catlin Underwriters Agencies Ltd, Canopius Managing Agents Ltd, Axis Corporate Capital U K Ltd, Axis Corporate Capital U K II Ltd for Certain Underwriters Lloyds London; Corporate Parent State National Insurance Co Inc for United Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp for Old Republic Union Insurance Co; Corporate Parent S C O R Reinsurance Co Inc for General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona; Corporate Parents Zurich Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Zurich American Insurance Co, Other Affiliates Zurich Holding Co of America Inc for Steadfast Insurance Co; Corporate Parents American International Group Inc, A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, A I G Property Casualty Inc for Lexington Insurance Co; Corporate Parents Safety National Casualty Corp, Tokyo Marine Holdings Inc for Safety Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents Q B E Atlantic L L C, Q B E Investments (North America) Inc, Q B E Insurance Holdings Pty Ltd, Other Affiliate Q B E Holdings Inc for Q B E Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents Hannover Re, H D I Global S E, Talanx A G for H D I Global Specialty S E. (aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified docket text on 12/29/2021 (Miletello, A).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendants; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Responses due by 2/3/2022.. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 12/22/2021. (jud,Joseph, David)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Counterclaim, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Proceedings with consent (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/21/2021.) by Magnolia Trace Apartment Homes L L C, Vintage Realty Co L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified docket text on 12/21/2021 (Miletello, A).
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Roaix, G)
December 21, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Counterclaim and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings Table of Contents and Table of Authorities by Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Rew, Phillip)
December 16, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings.(Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/16/2021.) Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Crick, S)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1-Case law, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rew, Phillip). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/16/2021 (Miletello, A). Modified on 12/17/2021 to indicate #7 Table of Contents submitted as separate document. (Crick, S).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 12/16/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim sent to Phillip J Rew on behalf of Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/29/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/15/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 14, 2021 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED PETITION against Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co filed by Vintage Realty Co L L C, Magnolia Trace Apartment Homes L L C. (9th JDC, Parish of Rapides, #271647, filed 9/17/2021). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1, Notice of Removal.(crt,Miletello, A)
December 14, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Petition, COUNTERCLAIM against Vintage Realty Co L L C, Magnolia Trace Apartment Homes L L C by United Specialty Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, Steadfast Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Co.(Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona(pty:dft), Lexington Insurance Co(pty:dft), Old Republic Union Insurance Co(pty:dft), Q B E Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Safety Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Steadfast Insurance Co(pty:dft), United Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified docket text on 12/15/2021 (Miletello, A).
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Rapides Parish, Case Number 271647 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4928694) filed by H D I Global Specialty S E, Certain Underwriters Lloyds London. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Arbitration Clause, #4 Exhibit C - Policy, #5 Exhibit Consents)(Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party Certain Underwriters Lloyds London(pty:dft), H D I Global Specialty S E(pty:dft))(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified docket text on 12/15/2021 (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vintage Realty Co L L C et al v. Certain Underwriters Lloyds London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vintage Realty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnolia Trace Apartment Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vintage Realty Co L L C
Represented By: Layne A Clark, Jr
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnolia Trace Apartment Homes L L C
Represented By: Layne A Clark, Jr
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters Lloyds London
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Union Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q B E Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H D I Global Specialty S E
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?