Neal v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Kevin Linn Neal
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv00936
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Jones, P)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/19/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/19/2022. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 7, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Jones, P)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Linn Neal. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lemoine, Peter)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Kevin Linn Neal. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Peter J Lemoine added to party Kevin Linn Neal(pty:pla))(aty,Lemoine, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Linn Neal
Represented By: Peter J Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?