Kibble v. Desselle et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Kibble
Defendant: CO Desselle, CO Nobility and CO Ganey
Case Number: 1:2022cv05960
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 RECEIVED Partial Filing Fee on behalf of Douglas Kibble in the amount of $31.57, receipt number 500000439. (crt,Savoy, A)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint/petition. Pro Se Response due by 1/9/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/9/2022. (crt,Haik, K)
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas Kibble. Clerk updated address to F C I - Pollock Medium. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $31.57. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/23/2022. (crt,Haik, K)
November 27, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/27/2022. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Douglas Kibble. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Williams, G) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2022: #2 Proposed order) (Devillier, W).
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Desselle, Ganey, Nobility filed by Douglas Kibble. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Williams, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kibble v. Desselle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Kibble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Desselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Nobility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Ganey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?