M P v. Joyce et al
Plaintiff: M P
Defendant: William P Joyce
Respondent: Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Melissa Harper, Kenneth Genalo and Warden LaSalle I C E Processing Center
Case Number: 1:2022cv06123
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 29 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, William P Joyce, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Melissa Harper, Kenneth Genalo, Warden LaSalle I C E Processing Center. (crt,Haik, K)
December 29, 2022 Filing 28 (FILED IN ERROR - PDF OMITTED) SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, William P Joyce, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Melissa Harper, Kenneth Genalo, Warden LaSalle I C E Processing Center. (crt,Haik, K) Modified on 12/29/2022 to reflect entry as filed in error - pdf omitted. Please see doc. 29 for summonses (Haik, K).
December 29, 2022 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding 28 Summons Issued - USA. Action taken: Clerk modified entry to reflect filed in error - pdf omitted. Please see doc. 29 for summonses. (crt,Haik, K)
December 28, 2022 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Melissa Harper, Kenneth Genalo, LaSalle ICE Processing Center Warden filed by M P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H: Supp. Decl. Tal Eisenzweig)(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Motion to Proceed Using Initials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/21/2022. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Edwin Henry Byrd, IV for Merrick Garland, William P Joyce,and Alejandro Mayorkas. Attorney Ilan Stein terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/20/2022. (crt,Breite, S)
December 19, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Substitute Attorney E. Henry Byrd, IV in place of Ilan Stein by Merrick Garland, William P Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Edwin Henry Byrd, IV added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Edwin Henry Byrd, IV added to party William P Joyce(pty:dft), Attorney Edwin Henry Byrd, IV added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft))(aty,Byrd, Edwin)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kshithij Shrinath for M P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/15/2022. (crt,Haik, K)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Zoe Pokempner Levine for M P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/15/2022. (crt,Haik, K)
December 13, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Kshithij Shrinath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5395062) by M P. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
December 13, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Zoe Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5395027) by M P. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/9/2022. (crt,Haik, K)
December 8, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/8/2022. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
December 6, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Scott Vogel on behalf of M P (Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party M P(pty:pla)) (aty,Vogel, Matthew)
December 6, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/6/2022. (crt,Devillier, W)
December 2, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
December 2, 2022 Filing 15 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-09581. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER On November 21, 2022, Respondents filed a letter requesting that this case be transferred to the Western District of Louisiana and that the Court waive the seven-day waiting period provided by Local Civil Rule 83.1. Dkt. 9. Petitioner consents to the requested transfer and the waiver of the waiting period. Dkt. 13. Therefore, this case is transferred to the Western District of Louisiana, and the Court waives the seven-day waiting period pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/29/2022) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 28, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kshithij Shrinath dated November 28, 2022 re: Transfer of Petition. Document filed by M. P...(Shrinath, Kshithij) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibit F, Psychological Evaluation, and Exhibit G, Declaration of Dr. Allen Keller. The request is granted. Petitioner may file both exhibits under seal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/22/2022) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER On November 21, 2022, Respondents filed a letter requesting that this case be transferred to the Western District of Louisiana, citing in particular this Court's decision in Singh v. Decker, No. 20 Civ. 9089 (JPC), 2021 WL 23328 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 4, 2021). Dkt. 9. Accordingly, Petitioner is directed to submit a letter to the Court by December 5, 2022 stating whether there is any reason to depart from the reasoning in that decision in this case. The Court will then determine whether to transfer this case or whether further briefing is necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/22/2022) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zoe Pokempner Levine on behalf of M. P...(Levine, Zoe) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Expedite consideration of the government's objection to jurisdiction/venue pursuant to Rumsfeld v. Padilla and request that this case be promptly transferred to the petitioner's district of confinement (the Western District of Louisiana) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Ilan Stein dated 11/21/2022. Document filed by Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Stein, Ilan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 8 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REDACTION to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, Ex. G, Decl. of Dr. Allen Keller by M. P., Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro MayorkasMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #5 .(Shrinath, Kshithij) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 7 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REDACTION to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, Ex. F, Psychological Evaluation by M. P., Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro MayorkasMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #5 .(Shrinath, Kshithij) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibit F, Psychological Evaluation, and Exhibit G, Declaration of Dr. Allen Keller addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kshithij Shrinath dated November 10, 2022. Document filed by M. P...(Shrinath, Kshithij) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION for Confidentiality of Petitioner's Identity and to Proceed Using Initials. . Document filed by M. P...(Shrinath, Kshithij) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Confidentiality of Petitioner's Identity and to Proceed Using Initials. Document filed by M. P...(Shrinath, Kshithij) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilan Stein on behalf of Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Stein, Ilan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kshithij Shrinath. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kshithij Shrinath. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shrinath, Kshithij) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26940286)Document filed by M. P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Reinstate, #2 Exhibit Notice of Detention, #3 Exhibit Declaration of M.P., #4 Exhibit Declaration of Allison Mandeville, Esq., #5 Exhibit Declaration of Tal Eisenzweig, Esq., #6 Exhibit Placeholder for Vazquez-Casals Eval, forthcoming under seal, #7 Exhibit Placeholder for Declaration of Dr. Allen Keller, forthcoming under seal).(Shrinath, Kshithij) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M P v. Joyce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M P
Represented By: Zoe Pokempner Levine
Represented By: Kshithij Shrinath
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Joyce
Represented By: Ilan Stein
Represented By: Edwin Henry Byrd, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Ilan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Ilan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Genalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden LaSalle I C E Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?