Ghirawoo v. Immigration & Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Riche Jahkeen Ghirawoo
Defendant: U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement and Shad M Rice
Case Number: 1:2022cv06142
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to District Director ICE. Served on 12/30/2022, answer due 2/28/2023 (crt,Haik, K)
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney. Served on 12/27/2022, answer due 2/28/2023. (crt,Haik, K)
January 5, 2023 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney General. Served on 12/30/2022, answer due 2/28/2023. (crt,Haik, K)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Warden La Salle ICE Processing Center. Served on 12/27/2022, answer due 2/27/2023. (crt,Haik, K)
December 21, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, District Director ICE, Warden LaSalle ICE Processing Center. (crt,Haik, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2022: #1 Certified mail receipts) (Haik, K).
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 1 Motion for Order to Show Cause. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/14/2022. (crt,Haik, K)
December 13, 2022 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Riche Jahkeen Ghirawoo in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500000421. (crt,Lemoine, N)
December 8, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/8/2022. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
December 7, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/7/2022. (crt,Devillier, W)
December 7, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Riche Jahkeen Ghirawoo. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Petition. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/7/2022. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to assign document number on 12/7/2022 (Devillier, W).
December 7, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghirawoo v. Immigration & Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riche Jahkeen Ghirawoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shad M Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?