Garcia-Flores v. Rice et al
Plaintiff: Jaime Aroldo Garcia-Flores and Jaime Aroldo Garcia Flores
Defendant: Shad Rice, Merrick Garland and Alejandro N Mayorkas
Case Number: 1:2023cv00194
Filed: February 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Intent to dismiss CASE for Failure to apprise court of change of address. (crt,Haik, K)
March 3, 2023 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Jaime Aroldo Garcia-Flores, LaSalle ICE Processing Center, re: 4 Jurisdictional Review Finding, returned marked: RTS. not here. (crt,Haik, K)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. (Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 3/23/2023). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis Form)(crt,Devillier, W)
February 21, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/21/2023. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
February 14, 2023 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/14/2023. (crt,Devillier, W)
February 13, 2023 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jaime Aroldo Garcia-Flores. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W). Motion/Application not on approved form.
February 13, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jaime Aroldo Garcia-Flores. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Bunting, M) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/14/2023) (Devillier, W).
February 13, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia-Flores v. Rice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Aroldo Garcia-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Aroldo Garcia Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shad Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro N Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?