Jones v. Samakow et al
Plaintiff: Ashley N Jones
Defendant: Law Offices of Paul A Samakow and Paul A Samakow
Case Number: 1:2024cv01322
Filed: September 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jerry Edwards
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Law Offices of Paul A Samakow, Paul A Samakow.(aty,Fritchie, Gustave)
October 2, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Law Offices of Paul A Samakow, Paul A Samakow . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Fritchie, Gustave)
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 9/30/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
September 30, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Law Offices of Paul A Samakow, Paul A Samakow. (aty,Fritchie, Gustave)
September 30, 2024 Filing 5 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Law Offices of Paul A Samakow, Paul A Samakow. (aty,Fritchie, Gustave)
September 27, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/27/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
September 27, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Gustave A Fritchie, III on behalf of Law Offices of Paul A Samakow, Paul A Samakow. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 10/10/2024. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 9/27/2024 to modify date. (Crick, S).
September 27, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Gustave A Fritchie, III on behalf of Law Offices of Paul A Samakow. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/11/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
September 26, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S)
September 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC, Case Number 280692 (Filing fee $405, receipt number CLAWDC-6069265) filed by Paul A. Samakow, the Law Offices of Paul A. Samakow. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A)(Attorney Gustave A Fritchie, III added to party Paul A. Samakow(pty:dft), Attorney Gustave A Fritchie, III added to party the Law Offices of Paul A. Samakow (pty:dft))(aty,Fritchie, Gustave)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Samakow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley N Jones
Represented By: Adrian Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Paul A Samakow
Represented By: Edward W Trapolin
Represented By: Chris H Irwin
Represented By: Gustave A Fritchie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A Samakow
Represented By: Edward W Trapolin
Represented By: Chris H Irwin
Represented By: Gustave A Fritchie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?