Smith v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Bennie L Smith
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2010cv00199
Filed: February 9, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 38 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that attorney fees in the amount of $30,458.25, less any award made by the Commissioner under Section 406(a), be paid to plaintiff's attorney James Spruel, Jr. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/29/13. (crt,Guillot, M)
April 16, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 29 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff be awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $4,400 payable on her behalf to her attorney, James Spruel, Jr. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 4/16/12. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 30, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING the 22 Report and Recommendations of the magistrate judge in re: 20 Motion to Remand. ORDERED Commissioner's decision is REVERSED AND VACATED pursuant to the fourth sentence of Section 405(g). ORDERED the case is REMANDED for further proceedings as set forth in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 08/30/2011. (crt,Leleux, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: John A Broadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie L Smith
Represented By: James Spruel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?