Aker Kvaerner I H I v. National Union Fire Insurance Co of Louisiana et al

Plaintiff: Aker Kvaerner I H I, Aker Solutions U S Inc and I H I Inc
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Allianz Global Risks U S Insurance Co, Commonwealth Insurance Co, Arch Specialty Insurance Co, Navigators Management Co Inc, McLarens Young International Inc, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Millenium Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Liberty Syndicate at Lloyds 4472
Case Number: 2:2010cv00278
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Cameron
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 09:0201 Enforcement of foreign arbitral awards
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2014 202 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING for reasons set forth in the 187 Report and Recommendations, the 178 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Commonwealth Insurance Co, McLarens Young International Inc, Navigators Management Co Inc, Allianz G lobal Risks U S Insurance Co, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Ltd, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh Pennsylvania, Arch Specialty Insurance Co be and is hereby GRANTED, and all disputes in this matter are hereby referred to arbitration. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 2/7/2014. (crt,Finn, P)
December 2, 2013 187 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the 178 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Commonwealth Insurance Co, McLarens Young International Inc, Navigators Management Co Inc, Allianz Global Risks U S Insurance Co, Associ ated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Ltd, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh Pennsylvania, Arch Specialty Insurance Co be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 12/19/2013. MEMORANDUM RULING denying 181 CROSS MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Aker Kvaerner I H I. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on December 2, 2013. (crt,Benoit, T)
July 9, 2013 176 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 165 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge of 157 Memorandum Ruling on 124 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony from John W. Hinchey, Esq.; 126 Cross MOTION in Limine to E xclude Expert Opinion Testimony from Robert M. Hall, Esq. and 6 MOTION to Remand filed by Aker Solutions U S Inc, I H I Inc, Aker Kvaerner I H I; the Magistrate Judge's ruling is AFFIRMED IN ITS ENTIRETY. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 7/8/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 6, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 6 MOTION to Remand filed by Aker Kvaerner I H I, Aker Solutions U S Inc, I H I Inc. The Court orders that the parties shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of this order to conduct discovery regarding the business operat ions and principal place of business of defendants as well as the underwriting, negotiation, drafting, and execution of the insurance policy at issue, with emphasis on the parties understanding of the alleged arbitration clause. Upon conclusion of th is period allowed to conduct discovery, defendants shall file any opposition to plaintiffs motion to remand within fifteen (15) days. Plaintiffs can submit a response to any opposition within ten (10) days of defendants filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/6/2010. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aker Kvaerner I H I v. National Union Fire Insurance Co of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: Roger E Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited
Represented By: Roger E Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks U S Insurance Co
Represented By: Roger E Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Insurance Co
Represented By: Roger E Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Roger E Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Management Co Inc
Represented By: Roger E Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLarens Young International Inc
Represented By: Roger E Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By: Roger E Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millenium Syndicate at Lloyds 1221
Represented By: Roger E Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Syndicate at Lloyds 4472
Represented By: Roger E Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aker Kvaerner I H I
Represented By: H Alan McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aker Solutions U S Inc
Represented By: H Alan McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I H I Inc
Represented By: H Alan McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?