Green et al v. Plantation of Louisiana L L C et al

Plaintiff: Krystal Green and Sarah Manuel
Defendant: Plantation of Louisiana L L C, Al Dicicco, Jechake Inc, Golding Enterprises L L C and Jerry Golding
Case Number: 2:2010cv00364
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2012 169 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING adopting Report and Recommendations re 161 Report and Recommendations : granting in part and denying in part 149 Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly,, the claims of Kathleen Becker, Ashley Broussard, Tanya Carrier, Mysti Harrison , Veronica Holland, Rachel Matt, Leslee Smith, Chelle Warrick Camp, Sara White, Danielle Billiot, Jessica Chambers, Amber Cormier, Erica Kershaw, Rebecca McKinney, Ryncadra Merrick, Jennifer Sonnier, and Lyndsey Wolfe are dismissed with prejudice und er FRCP Rule 37(b)(2)(A)(v) for failing to obey this Court's May 29, 2012 discovery Order. The claims of Florita Lee, Megan Beard, Autumn Whatley, Christine Killinger and Latonya Waters are dismissed without prejudcie so that their claims may proceed to arbitration. Otherwise, the motion is DENIED, the claims of Shylah Shewmake, Mary Ann Girgis, Tiffany Hinch and, Ebony Murreld shall remain pending before this Court. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/10/12. (crt,Roaix, G)
December 15, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Certify Class; adopting Report and Recommendations re 49 Report and Recommendations. The plaintiffs' right to request conditional certification of other classes of employees holding other positions after preliminary discovery and further clarification of the pleadings is reserved. The court will make the determination at the conclusion of discovery when it may properly analyze the validity of the arbitration agreements.Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 12/15/2010. (crt,Reasor, M)
November 24, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 27 MOTION to Certify Class as an FLSA Collective Action filed by All Plaintiffs Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 11/24/2010. (crt,Davenport, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Plantation of Louisiana L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Green
Represented By: John Lee Hoffoss, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Manuel
Represented By: John Lee Hoffoss, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plantation of Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Merrick J Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Dicicco
Represented By: Merrick J Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jechake Inc
Represented By: Merrick J Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golding Enterprises L L C
Represented By: Merrick J Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Golding
Represented By: Merrick J Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?