Beane v. Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co et al

Plaintiff: Monique L Beane
Defendant: Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co and Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association Inc
Case Number: 2:2010cv00781
Filed: May 13, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Beauregard
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 417 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 325 Motion in Limine filed by plaintiff, Monique Beane, to exclude 14 different types of evidence. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/6/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 6, 2013 412 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 329 Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Witnesses not Disclosed until February 11, 2013 filed by Utility Trailer Manufacturing. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/6/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 1, 2013 283 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 277 Motion for Protective Order; denying 277 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/1/13. (crt,Kennedy, T)
November 12, 2012 210 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 204 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/12/12. (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 21, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 77 MOTION to Compel filed by Monique L Beane. Plaintiff's requests for production numbers 10, 11, and 27 through31 are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/21/2011. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beane v. Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique L Beane
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co
Represented By: Raymond L Brown, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association Inc
Represented By: Donald J Armand, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?