Smith Maritime Inc v. Lay D/B Akpevweoghene et al

Plaintiff: Smith Maritime Inc
Defendant: Lay D/B Akpevweoghene and Fenog Nigeria Ltd
Case Number: 2:2011cv00731
Filed: May 13, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0740
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2014 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 143 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Generation Marine Services Inc, and 141 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Smith Maritime Inc and the 165 Motion Hearing concerning information provided to the court under seal f rom Smith Maritime and possibility of attorney-client privilege for Fenog. Court determines items may have been subject to attorney-client privilege. It is also recognized that attorney-client privilege is voluntarily waived when disclosed in a mann er inconsistent with the confidential nature of the attorney client relationship. Should Fenog wish to argue this waiver was somehow inadvertent, it is to notify the court by filing an appropriate pleading on or before November 19, 2014. Should nothing be filed addressing this issue by that time the information will be unsealed and made available to Smith Maritime and GMSI. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/14/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 15, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 138 MOTION to Withdraw Bland & Partners as Attorney ; 139 Amended MOTION to Withdraw Bland & Partners as Attorney filed by Lay D/B Akpevweoghene, Fenog Nigeria Ltd. For the reasons stated, the court finds that the motion to withdraw should be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on October 15, 2014. (crt,Benoit, T)
January 10, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 59 MOTION for Reconsideration re 56 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Lay D/B Akpevweoghene, Fenog Nigeria Ltd. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/10/13. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith Maritime Inc v. Lay D/B Akpevweoghene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Maritime Inc
Represented By: Francis X Neuner, Jr
Represented By: Jed Michel Mestayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lay D/B Akpevweoghene
Represented By: David S Bland
Represented By: Brendhan H Thompson
Represented By: Robert P Vining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fenog Nigeria Ltd
Represented By: David S Bland
Represented By: Brendhan H Thompson
Represented By: Robert P Vining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?