Henryv. O'Charleys Inc et al

Plaintiff: Carol Henry
Defendant: O'Charleys Service Co, Jared Heath, O'Charleys Inc and O'Charleys Inc of Tennessee
Case Number: 2:2011cv01330
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 36 Motion in Limine filed by defendant, O'Charley's LLC. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/6/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 1, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by O'Charleys L L C, O'Charleys Service Co, and granting 37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Medical Causation as to Plaintiff's Post Incident Blackouts filed by O'Charleys L L C, O'Charleys Service Co. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 2/27/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 24, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 22 Report and Recommendations, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff's claims against Jared Heath and O'Charleys, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 2/23/12. (crt,Finn, P)
January 30, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 4 MOTION to Remand filed by Carol Henry and 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal with opposition filed by O'Charleys Inc of Tennessee and O'Charleys Service Co. ORDER DENYING [4 ] MOTION to Remand filed by Carol Henry, GRANTING 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal with opposition filed by O'Charleys Inc of Tennessee and O'Charleys Service Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 01/30/12. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henryv. O'Charleys Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Charleys Service Co
Represented By: Craig Joseph Canizaro
Represented By: Peter J Wanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Heath
Represented By: Craig Joseph Canizaro
Represented By: Peter J Wanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Charleys Inc
Represented By: Peter J Wanek
Represented By: Craig Joseph Canizaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Charleys Inc of Tennessee
Represented By: Peter J Wanek
Represented By: Craig Joseph Canizaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Henry
Represented By: Paul Plauche Marks
Represented By: H Alan McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?