Martin v. Tesoro Corp et al

Plaintiff: Bill Martin
Defendant: Koch Oil Co, Tesoro Crude Oil Company, Pelican Crude Inc, B P America Production Co, Tesoro Corp, Koch Industries Inc and ConocoPhillips Pipe Line Co
Case Number: 2:2011cv01413
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Cameron
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 95 MOTION to Quash Deposition Notice issued by Bill Martin or, in the alternative MOTION for Protective Order filed by Tesoro Corp. It is ORDERED that Tesoro's Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/12/2012. (crt,Benoit, T)
May 21, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 51 MOTION for More Definite Statement pursuant to Rule 12(e) and 51 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Koch Industries Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 5/21/12. (crt,FinnSld, P) Modified on 5/22/2012 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
January 17, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING that the 13 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by B P America Production Co, B P America Co will be denied as mootand the 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b) filed by B P America Production Co will be denied. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/3/12. (crt,Finn, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Tesoro Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Oil Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Crude Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelican Crude Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B P America Production Co
Represented By: Amy D Berret
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: James P Dore'
Represented By: Robert Benn Vincent, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Corp
Represented By: Kirk Norris Aurandt
Represented By: John Fredrick Kesseniche
Represented By: Jon Van Steenis
Represented By: Jon A Van Steenis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Industries Inc
Represented By: Neil C Abramson
Represented By: Nora Bolling Bilbro
Represented By: Steven Jay Levine
Represented By: John B Shortess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Pipe Line Co
Represented By: Megan E Donohue
Represented By: William D Lampton
Represented By: Joshua A Norris
Represented By: Carmen M Rodriguez
Represented By: Gary J Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Martin
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Jonathan Fontenot
Represented By: Kenneth T Fibich
Represented By: Kurt B Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?