Cormies Grocery & Deli Inc v. Colony Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Cormies Grocery & Deli Inc
Defendant: Mike Demarie Insurance Agency Inc, Colony Insurance Co and Mike Demarie
Case Number: 2:2012cv00562
Filed: March 2, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Cormies Grocery & Deli Inc, 72 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Colony Insurance Co. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 04/04/13. (crt,Burge, J)
September 7, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 37 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED that the 8 Motion to Remand is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the 13 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED and the claims against Mike Demarie and Mike Demarie Insurance Agency Inc are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 9/6/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 16, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 13 Motion to Strike Affidavit of Christopher Cormie and Unauthenticated Exhibit Attached to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; denying 8 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/16/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cormies Grocery & Deli Inc v. Colony Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Demarie Insurance Agency Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Insurance Co
Represented By: Joseph L Spilman, III
Represented By: Michael J Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Demarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cormies Grocery & Deli Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey L Raizner
Represented By: Matthew Scott Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?