Landry et al v. Haye et al

Plaintiff: Marshall Landry, Ernest Boyde and Bobby Knott
Defendant: William S Haye, Quality Carriers Inc and American Inter Fidelity
Case Number: 2:2012cv02766
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Jefferson Davis
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Bobby Knott, Marshall Landry. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 9/29/15. (crt,Roaix, G)
January 30, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER denying 47 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 46 Order on Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Landry and Knotts, shall respond as mandated by Magistrate Judge Kay's order of Dece mber 17, 2012 no later than 21 days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants are awarded the legal fees and costs. Defendants shall file detailed documentation itemizing the costs and attorneys fees associated with the secon d motion to compel and this appeal no later than 21 days form the date of this order. Plaintiffs may file any objection and/or traversal no later than 14 days thereafter, after which the court will then consider and decide upon the amount of the award to be granted to defendants. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/30/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
November 21, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Compel and for Contempt, MOTION for Attorney Fees. For the reasons concluded in open court on November 7, 2013, the Motion to Compel should be denied as to plaintiff Boyde but granted as to the remaining plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/21/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)
November 5, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Quality Carriers Inc. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 11/5/13. (crt,Guillot, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landry et al v. Haye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Landry
Represented By: Derriel C McCorvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Boyde
Represented By: Derriel C McCorvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Knott
Represented By: Derriel C McCorvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S Haye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Carriers Inc
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Represented By: Brian Eugene Sevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Inter Fidelity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?