American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association v. Crawford et al

Plaintiff: American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association
Defendant: Calisia N Crawford and Stacy A Crawford
Case Number: 2:2013cv02765
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Beauregard
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Calisia N Crawford is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on September 7, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)
April 26, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 39 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 04/23/2016. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 26, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 17 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stacy A Crawford. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/15/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association v. Crawford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association
Represented By: Jennifer M Lawrence
Represented By: Virginia N Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calisia N Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy A Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?