Bruce v. Terrell et al

Plaintiff: Robert Franklin Bruce
Defendant: Terry Terrell, G E O Corp, Harmon, Angela Eason, Tina Messner, McCallon, Doddin and Granger
Case Number: 2:2013cv02779
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Allen
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that the 72 Motion for Summary Judgment be and hereby is GRANTED and the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on September 23, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)
March 28, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 69 Report and Recommendations; IT IS ORDERED that the defendants' 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and plaintiff's claims relating to exposure to secondhand smoke and discrimination under the ADA are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/25/2016. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 17, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 13 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that the 1 Complaint filed by Robert Franklin Bruce be and hereby is DISMISSED, IN PART, WITH PREJUDICE, as frivolous and for failing to state a claim for which relief may be granted pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 12/13/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 2, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/2/2014. (crt,Gregory, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. Terrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Franklin Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E O Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Messner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?