Parish Disposal Industries L L C v. B F I Waste Services L L C et al

Plaintiff: Parish Disposal Industries L L C
Defendant: B F I Waste Systems of Louisiana L L C, B F I Waste Services L L C, B F I Waste Systems of North America L L C and Danny Hylton
Case Number: 2:2013cv03068
Filed: November 13, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by B F I Waste Systems of North America L L C, B F I Waste Systems of Louisiana L L C, B F I Waste Services L L C. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 12/5/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 21, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that defendant Danny Hylton be and hereby is DISMISSED as a defendant from this matter. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 10/20/2014. (crt,Finn, P)
May 27, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: For the foregoing reasons: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs 11 Motion for Leave to Amend is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs 12 Motion to Remand is DENIED. A Report and Recommendation that Hylton be dismissed will issue for reasons stated above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/27/2014. (crt,Putch, A) Modified on 5/28/2014 to reflect correct judge. (Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parish Disposal Industries L L C v. B F I Waste Services L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B F I Waste Systems of Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: G Trippe Hawthorne
Represented By: Terrence D McCay
Represented By: Bradley C Myers
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Represented By: Edward B Schwartz
Represented By: Henry N Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B F I Waste Services L L C
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: G Trippe Hawthorne
Represented By: Terrence D McCay
Represented By: Bradley C Myers
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Represented By: Edward B Schwartz
Represented By: Henry N Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B F I Waste Systems of North America L L C
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: G Trippe Hawthorne
Represented By: Terrence D McCay
Represented By: Bradley C Myers
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Represented By: Edward B Schwartz
Represented By: Henry N Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Hylton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parish Disposal Industries L L C
Represented By: James F DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?